|
|
1995-10-31 - 2018-03-07
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 27, ap.(of.) 13
|
|
|
|
2008-06-10 - 2009-02-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Lomonosov M., 40/2, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
1992-12-29 - 2018-11-20
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August 1989, 4/a
|
|
|
|
1995-07-27 - 2018-03-05
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 114, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
2008-06-10 - 2010-11-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 21/1, ap.(of.) 85
|
|
|
|
2020-07-06
Floreşti, str. Mircea cel Bătrîn, 8
|
|
|
|
2008-06-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 59/2, ap.(of.) 37
|
|
|
|
1998-06-25 - 2008-06-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Plotnikov str-la, 8, ap.(of.) 81
|
|
|
|
2008-06-16
mun. Chişinău, Ciorescu, str. Viilor, 2, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
1995-01-24 - 2020-09-15
Şoldăneşti, str. Komarov Vladimir, 24
|
|
|
|
1999-09-30 - 2008-06-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 32, ap.(of.) 20
|
|
|
|
2008-06-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 3, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
1999-05-25 - 2021-03-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 5, ap.(of.) 181
|
|
|
|
1995-02-23 - 2018-11-20
Căuşeni, Sălcuţa
|
|
|
|
1996-08-21 - 2008-06-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 2/3, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2008-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 32/2, ap.(of.) 92
|
|
|
|
2008-02-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 19/a
|
|
|
|
2008-06-11 - 2009-11-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 33/2
|
|
|
|
2011-05-16 - 2017-11-14
Rîşcani, str. Şevcenko T., 84
|
|
|
|
2008-06-17
Ialoveni, Răzeni
|
|
|
|
2006-12-12
mun. Chişinău, Bubuieci, str. Grădinarilor, 2/1
|
|
|
|
2008-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 19, ap.(of.) 119
|
|
|
|
2008-06-11
mun. Chişinău, Cricova, str. Minerilor, 26, ap.(of.) 6
|
|
|
|
2008-06-17
Străşeni, str. Orheiului, 28, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
1999-09-22 - 2017-05-29
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 175/a
|
|
|
|
2008-06-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 15, ap.(of.) 30
|
|
|
|
2008-06-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Pelivan Ion, 30/4, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2008-06-12 - 2011-11-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bucureşti, 13/1
|
|
|
|
2003-02-12 - 2017-04-19
Leova, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 31
|
|
|
|
2008-06-12
Ialoveni, str. Ştefănucă Petre, 34, ap.(of.) 51
|
|
|
|
2008-06-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 75/V, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2007-05-18
Cahul, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 3/A
|
|
|
|
2008-06-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 26/1, ap.(of.) 110
|
|
|
|
1996-05-16 - 2019-05-17
UTA Găgăuzia, Gaidar, str. Lenin, 69
|
|
|
|
2020-07-06
Cahul, str. Dunării, 15
|
|