|
|
1998-04-09 - 2007-10-29
Cahul, str. Lăutarilor, 10
|
|
|
|
2007-08-28
Cahul, str. Stroescu V., 38, ap.(of.) 54
|
|
|
|
2000-03-16
Cantemir, Stoianovca
|
|
|
|
2007-09-21 - 2008-03-28
Cantemir, Cania
|
|
|
|
2007-09-04
Cantemir, Cociulia
|
|
|
|
2006-11-16
Donduşeni, Elizavetovca
|
|
|
|
2014-06-23
Donduşeni, str. Cantemir D., 104
|
|
|
|
2007-09-13 - 2024-05-30
Cantemir, Cania
|
|
|
|
2015-08-06 - 2017-03-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 206, ap.(of.) 162
|
|
|
|
1996-06-06 - 2009-01-27
Orhei, Vatici
|
|
|
|
2020-03-04
Străşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 50, ap.(of.) 7
|
|
|
|
2017-08-30 - 2020-09-14
Şoldăneşti, Cuşmirca
|
|
|
|
1996-04-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 52
|
|
|
|
2008-06-24 - 2017-12-19
Edineţ, str. Staroobreadcescaia, 43
|
|
|
|
1995-03-27 - 2017-06-15
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Puşkin A., 36, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2011-08-10 - 2018-08-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 13, ap.(of.) 188
|
|
|
|
2014-06-19
Floreşti, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 74
|
|
|
|
2007-09-11
Cahul, str. Mateevici A., 8/b
|
|
|
|
2007-09-11
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 17, ap.(of.) 101
|
|
|
|
2007-09-14
Taraclia, Tvardiţa, str. Ceapaev, 246
|
|
|
|
2015-09-09 - 2017-03-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Caucaz str-la 1, 12
|
|
|
|
1992-09-21 - 2019-05-17
Călăraşi, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 11
|
|
|
|
1996-08-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Eminescu M. bd., 42, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
2011-07-01
Anenii Noi, Varniţa, str. Tighina, 58
|
|
|
|
2003-09-15 - 2018-05-12
Cahul, Frumuşica
|
|
|
|
2016-12-05
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Rareş Petru, 14/1
|
|
|
|
2007-09-26
Taraclia, Budăi
|
|
|
|
2011-08-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Meşterul Manole, 6/1
|
|
|
|
2007-09-19 - 2009-06-22
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 115, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
2017-03-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Russo Alecu, 7/2, ap.(of.) 19
|
|
|
|
2017-03-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 18, ap.(of.) 74
|
|
|
|
2007-09-14 - 2009-03-17
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 121, ap.(of.) 18
|
|
|
|
1995-05-03 - 2010-12-20
Cahul, str. Cantemir D., 20
|
|
|
|
1994-08-22 - 2011-01-17
Cahul, str. Bălcescu N., 3, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
1995-09-01 - 2007-12-29
Cahul, str. Nencev Teodor, 35, ap.(of.) 2
|
|