Body maintenance activities
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2003-01-31
Bălţi, str. Turghenev, 62 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-25
Bălţi, str. Cantemir D., 36 |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-13
Bălţi, str. Suceava, 15, ap.(of.) 43 |
||
Administrator |
2002-06-19
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 133 |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-21
Bălţi, str. Decebal, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-11 - 2018-01-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 76/5, ap.(of.) 62 |
||
Administrator |
2009-07-08 - 2020-08-19
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
2000-04-18
Glodeni, Cobani |
||
Administrator |
2002-08-14
mun. Chişinău, Tohatin |
||
Administrator |
1997-06-24
Rîşcani, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 72 |
||
Administrator |
2003-08-19
Făleşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 21/A |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-14
Bălţi, str. Parhomenko Alexandr, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2003-09-16
Sîngerei, str. Independenţei, 94, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
2001-05-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Constituţiei, 8, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2000-09-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Maiorescu Titu, 10A, ap.(of.) 4A |
||
Administrator |
2002-04-05 - 2009-10-13
Bălţi, str. Larisa bd., 6, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-05 - 2019-07-12
Făleşti, Sărata Veche |
||
Administrator |
2005-10-17
Străşeni, Zubreşti |
||
Administrator |
2003-03-25 - 2012-04-03
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 137, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-27
Cahul, Brînza |
||
Administrator |
2003-06-27
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 119, ap.(of.) 36 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2011-11-29 - 2017-11-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 61, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-28 - 2012-01-13
Cahul, Crihana Veche |
||
Administrator |
2003-04-11 - 2020-04-16
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Pobedî, 201 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-12
Cahul, str. Cibotari Maria, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Vlaicu Pârcălab, 38, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2003-04-30 - 2009-04-24
Ocniţa, Rediul Mare |
||
Administrator |
2005-07-29 - 2020-08-21
Drochia, Sofia |
||
Administrator |
1999-07-22
Briceni, Criva |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-27
Briceni, str. <, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-28 - 2018-04-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Sfîntul Andrei, 36, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2010-07-22 - 2020-04-17
Hînceşti, Călmăţui |
||
Administrator |
2000-01-24
Ocniţa, Dîngeni |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-24 - 2020-04-17
Hînceşti, Căţeleni |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-22
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 23/a |