Services of barbershops and other services of cosmetic cabinets
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-02-03 - 2015-12-21
Anenii Noi, Geamăna |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-23 - 2020-02-17
Sîngerei, Coşcodeni |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-29 - 2015-09-04
Sîngerei, str. Independenţei, 104, ap.(of.) 26 |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-15 - 2020-02-17
Sîngerei, str. Barbu Lăutaru, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-16 - 2017-02-10
Cahul, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 67 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-25 - 2016-05-13
Cahul, Borceag, str. Creangă Ion, 28 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-29 - 2020-02-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Măcieşilor, 28 |
||
Administrator |
1992-07-02 - 2015-09-11
Orhei, str. Chişinăului, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-28 - 2015-06-24
Floreşti, Cuhureştii de Jos |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-14 - 2015-06-16
Căuşeni, Taraclia |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-29 - 2015-07-15
Căuşeni, Căinari, str. Corceac |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-26 - 2015-10-06
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August, 8, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator |
2015-01-30 - 2016-09-14
Nisporeni, Iurceni |
||
Administrator |
2015-01-21 - 2015-12-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Bolgarscaia, 87, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-20 - 2016-02-03
Anenii Noi, str. 1 Mai, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-29 - 2016-04-05
Ialoveni, Văratic |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-20 - 2016-04-26
Străşeni, Lozova |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-18 - 2017-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mioriţa, 3/1, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-23 - 2017-03-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 9/1 B |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-21 - 2017-02-14
mun. Chişinău, Ciorescu, str. Frunze M., 20 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-25 - 2017-05-05
Criuleni, Măgdăceşti |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-30 - 2016-06-01
Rîşcani, str. Trandafirilor, 23 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-01 - 2016-07-14
Rîşcani, str. Lazăr Gheorghe, 9 |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-12 - 2016-03-25
Sîngerei, Copăceni |
||
2002-04-19 - 2010-06-10
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Fedico, 19, ap.(of.) 18 |
|||
Administrator |
1997-06-10 - 2016-03-24
Floreşti, str. Viteazul Mihai, 70, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2014-08-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Suceviţa, 36/2, ap.(of.) 41B |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-04 - 2017-04-10
Căuşeni, Chircăieştii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-05
Anenii Noi, str. Chişinăului, 65 |
||
Administrator |
1994-07-05 - 2016-08-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Matrosov, 3A, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1992-06-04 - 2016-09-30
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Gorkii, 5 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-30 - 2017-04-20
Criuleni, str. 31 August, 83, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-13 - 2017-04-19
Ialoveni, Dănceni |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-23 - 2019-01-04
Edineţ, str. Hotin, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2003-12-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Anestiade N., 3, ap.(of.) 10 |