|
|
1997-04-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni Gavril, 57, ap.(of.) 31
|
|
|
|
1998-02-18 - 2000-06-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 20/2, ap.(of.) 85
|
|
|
|
1998-04-16 - 2002-02-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Kiev, 16/1, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1998-10-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 14/1, ap.(of.) 5
|
|
|
|
1992-08-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 28/3, ap.(of.) 47
|
|
|
|
2001-06-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 109/3, ap.(of.) 187
|
|
|
|
1992-10-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Belinski V., 67
|
|
|
|
2013-10-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Grenoble, 39, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2007-10-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Schinoasa, 27
|
|
|
|
2014-01-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 58/1
|
|
|
|
1992-12-31 - 1999-12-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 8
|
|
|
|
1994-04-06
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 40, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
2009-09-21 - 2021-09-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 26, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2011-02-14 - 2023-11-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 4, ap.(of.) 72
|
|
|
|
2009-08-04 - 2021-02-01
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Frunze M., 1K/3, ap.(of.) 17
|
|
|
|
1998-07-29 - 2021-09-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 12, ap.(of.) 35
|
|
|
|
2003-11-03 - 2018-12-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bucureşti, 46, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
1996-01-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 96/2, ap.(of.) 47
|
|
|
|
1997-11-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 10, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
2012-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Anestiade N., 8
|
|
|
|
2009-10-15
Ialoveni, Ulmu, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 12
|
|
|
|
1998-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Frumuşica, 6, ap.(of.) 72
|
|
|
|
1999-06-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 60/5, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2014-03-19 - 2020-01-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alexandrescu Grigore, 5
|
|
|
|
2002-04-23 - 2020-09-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Universităţii, 13, ap.(of.) 1
|
|
|
|
2015-01-20 - 2018-05-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu Mihail, 12/1, ap.(of.) 24
|
|
|
|
2004-06-03 - 2019-11-07
Bălţi, str. 1 Mai, 133/A
|
|
|
|
1992-10-20 - 2000-03-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Cibotari Maria, 8
|
|
|
|
1992-12-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Codrilor, 10
|
|
|
|
1994-08-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coca E., 35, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
1996-03-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Roşiori, 30
|
|
|
|
1997-05-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bisericii, 4
|
|
|
|
1997-07-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 4, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
2008-02-05 - 2021-02-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 99
|
|
|
|
1997-09-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 45
|
|