Consultation activities for business and management
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2013-12-18 - 2014-09-23
Orhei, Brăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-20 - 2016-08-29
Rezina, Echimăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-31 - 2016-09-30
Şoldăneşti, Olişcani |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-20 - 2013-09-12
Floreşti, Lunga |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-20 - 2016-06-20
Floreşti, Ciutuleşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-15 - 2015-06-04
Drochia, Hăsnăşenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-04 - 2016-03-01
Soroca, Visoca |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-07 - 2015-11-24
Drochia, Chetrosu |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-25 - 2016-11-02
Floreşti, Ştefăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-13 - 2013-04-16
Ştefan Vodă, Feşteliţa, str. Moga Alexei, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-18 - 2015-01-30
Căuşeni, Zaim |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-18 - 2014-04-07
Ştefan Vodă, Talmaza, str. Biruinţei |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-25 - 2016-08-25
Căuşeni, Ciufleşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-19 - 2015-08-07
Ştefan Vodă, Căplani, str. Cîmpiilor |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-18 - 2017-02-08
Căuşeni, Taraclia, str. Kalinin, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-18 - 2017-02-02
Ştefan Vodă, Olăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-16 - 2014-11-20
Ungheni, Petreşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-01 - 2013-11-11
Nisporeni, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-16 - 2016-04-21
Călăraşi, Sadova |
||
Administrator |
2013-09-11 - 2015-10-19
Ungheni, Rădenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-23 - 2014-12-30
Ungheni, Mănoileşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-26 - 2014-02-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Galaţan, 48 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-03 - 2017-03-01
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Gorkii, 31 |
||
Administrator |
2004-08-16 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 62/3 |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-10 - 2017-04-27
UTA Găgăuzia, Gaidar, str. Suvorov A., 14 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-01-15 - 2016-08-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfânt bd., 180, ap.(of.) 1210 |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-27 - 2015-01-12
Criuleni, str. Stepelor, 21 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-05 - 2016-12-12
Anenii Noi, Şerpeni |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-11 - 2014-12-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 5/1, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-21 - 2016-09-27
Dubăsari, Doroţcaia |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-04 - 2015-09-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coca E., 25/1, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-16 - 2017-03-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ureche Gr., 70 |
||
Lichidator |
2014-05-05 - 2016-07-01
Călăraşi, Temeleuţi |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-07 - 2015-04-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru Petru, 9, ap.(of.) 40 |
||
Administrator |
1992-11-13 - 2014-05-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 1, ap.(of.) 87 |