|
|
1999-10-20 - 2020-06-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 53/3, ap.(of.) 67
|
|
|
|
2013-08-01 - 2020-06-18
Teleneşti, Negureni
|
|
|
|
2005-03-28 - 2015-12-08
Bălţi, str. Tiraspol, 9/A
|
|
|
|
2007-03-29 - 2015-11-03
Orhei, str. Costin Miron, 10
|
|
|
|
2008-08-14 - 2015-10-30
Rezina, str. Voluntarilor, 12, ap.(of.) 15
|
|
|
|
2013-12-12 - 2021-04-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Valea Trandafirilor, 6/1, ap.(of.) 143
|
|
|
|
2009-02-16 - 2021-04-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dimineţii, 48, ap.(of.) 95
|
|
|
|
2003-07-31 - 2021-04-13
Bălţi, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 45, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
2010-10-28 - 2022-04-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Suceviţa, 38/2, ap.(of.) 1A
|
|
|
|
2007-02-05 - 2021-04-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 82/1, ap.(of.) 43
|
|
|
|
2007-08-09
Orhei, str. Şevcenko T., 14
|
|
|
|
2009-07-16 - 2021-05-14
Orhei, str. Eminescu Mihai, 15, ap.(of.) 53
|
|
|
|
2001-07-26 - 2022-05-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 80/4, ap.(of.) 57
|
|
|
|
1993-06-22 - 2021-06-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 61/2, ap.(of.) 127
|
|
|
|
2005-11-17 - 2021-06-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Unirii Principatelor piaţa, 1, ap.(of.) 391
|
|
|
|
2007-03-19 - 2022-05-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mesager, 5/2
|
|
|
|
2012-08-24 - 2021-06-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Melestiu, 16/2, ap.(of.) 4A
|
|
|
|
2008-03-24 - 2021-06-10
Edineţ, str. Lazo S., 5
|
|
|
|
2011-09-27 - 2021-06-21
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 5
|
|
|
|
2011-06-22
Şoldăneşti, str. Regiei, 77
|
|
|
|
1998-01-14 - 2023-10-24
Leova, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 12, ap.(of.) 82
|
|
|
|
2014-11-10
mun. Chişinău, Tohatin
|
|
|
|
2014-12-02 - 2022-05-20
Bălţi, str. Iablocikin Ghenadie, 3
|
|
|
|
1998-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 12
|
|
|
|
2008-04-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ceucari, 2/4, ap.(of.) 16
|
|
|
|
2003-06-23 - 2022-05-23
Bălţi, str. Independenţei, 30
|
|
|
|
2013-04-26 - 2022-05-27
Cantemir, Ţiganca
|
|
|
|
2001-11-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 6, ap.(of.) 22
|
|
|
|
1992-11-23 - 2022-11-21
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 71, ap.(of.) 51
|
|
|
|
1998-05-06 - 2022-07-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Academiei, 3/5, ap.(of.) 18
|
|
|
|
1993-04-23 - 2022-06-20
Bălţi, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 7, ap.(of.) 14
|
|
|
|
2014-07-31 - 2022-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Profesor Ion Dumeniuk, 24, ap.(of.) 84
|
|
|
|
2009-06-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mitropolit Petru Movilă, 23/3, ap.(of.) 9
|
|
|
|
2001-09-06 - 2024-07-02
Briceni, Colicăuţi
|
|
|
|
2002-04-03 - 2023-09-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 37/1, ap.(of.) 26
|
|