Bars and other beverage serving activities
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1994-11-02 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Renaşterii, 73, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-07 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Decebal, 2, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-07 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, Verejeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-28 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 69 |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-23 - 2017-08-17
Cimişlia, Hîrtop |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-06 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Viilor, 26 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-07 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Rareş Petru, 3, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-07 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. 31 August, 81 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-20 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Rareş Petru, 3, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-21 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Sadoveanu M., 1, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-27 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Dragoş Vodă, 12 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-28 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Decebal, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2015-11-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Crîngului, 2, ap.(of.) 26 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-08 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 10, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2011-08-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 19/3, ap.(of.) 85 |
||
Administrator |
2021-10-25
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 34 |
||
Administrator |
2016-02-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Drumul Crucii, 74 |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-08 - 2019-04-01
Basarabeasca, Başcalia |
||
Administrator |
2016-04-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Voluntarilor, 10, ap.(of.) 184 |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-23 - 2018-07-18
Teleneşti, Zahareuca |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-15 - 2020-01-27
Hînceşti, str. 31 August 1989, 66 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-28 - 2019-04-01
Basarabeasca, str. Rachetnaia, 1A |
||
Administrator |
2017-07-24
mun. Chişinău, Tohatin, str. Cantemir D., 10 |
||
Administrator |
2017-07-24
Criuleni, Boşcana |
||
Administrator |
2015-05-04
mun. Chişinău, Coloniţa, str. Bucov E., 1 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-20 - 2019-04-01
Leova, Iargara, str. 31 August 1989, 242 |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-20 - 2019-04-01
Leova, Sărata Nouă, str. Tinereţii, 32 |
||
Administrator |
2017-11-28
Drochia, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 96 |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-16 - 2019-04-01
Leova, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 76 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-28 - 2019-04-01
Leova, Tomai |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-08
Bălţi, str. Dostoevschi, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-28 - 2019-04-01
Leova, str. Varlaam, 14, ap.(of.) 331 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-02 - 2019-04-01
Leova, Cuporani |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-02 - 2019-04-01
Leova, str. Independenţei, 50, ap.(of.) 56 |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-13 - 2019-04-01
Leova, Troiţa |