Bars and other beverage serving activities
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-06-27 - 2017-05-03
Ialoveni, Ulmu |
||
Administrator |
2024-08-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Mioriţa, 1/B, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
2021-01-06
Floreşti, Sănătăuca |
||
Administrator |
2019-12-27
Teleneşti, str. Cantemir Dimitrie, 33 |
||
Administrator |
2024-06-28
mun. Chişinău, Hulboaca, str. Eminescu Mihai, 73A |
||
Administrator |
2016-03-21 - 2016-07-11
Cantemir, Cania, str. Eminescu Mihai, 35 |
||
Administrator |
2016-04-27 - 2016-09-30
Cahul, str. Negruzzi Constantin, 141, ap.(of.) 58 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-10 - 2016-04-25
Edineţ, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 65, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-20 - 2016-03-04
Leova, str. Cîmpiilor, 19 |
||
Administrator |
2019-01-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ismail, 69 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-12 - 2016-04-14
Hînceşti, Bujor |
||
Administrator |
2016-04-27 - 2016-07-05
Leova, Borogani |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-06 - 2016-06-13
Basarabeasca, str. Privoczalinaia |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-14 - 2016-08-29
Hînceşti, Ciuciuleni |
||
Administrator |
1997-05-06 - 2016-09-14
Leova, str. Dacia, 16 |
||
Administrator |
2016-10-18 - 2016-11-25
Cimişlia, Fetiţa |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-16 - 2016-12-13
Hînceşti, Ciuciuleni |
||
Administrator |
1994-07-15 - 2016-01-22
Teleneşti, Ineşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-14 - 2016-02-05
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 9, ap.(of.) 60 |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-01 - 2016-01-29
Teleneşti, str. Vieru Igor, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-27 - 2016-01-29
Teleneşti, Chiţcanii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-26 - 2016-02-03
Şoldăneşti, Rogojeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-26 - 2016-03-15
Orhei, str. Unirii, 146, ap.(of.) 65 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-16 - 2016-02-19
Şoldăneşti, Alcedar |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-15 - 2016-02-15
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-05 - 2016-02-10
Teleneşti, Sărătenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
1999-03-24 - 2016-03-15
Şoldăneşti, str. Eminescu Mihai, 48 |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-14 - 2016-03-04
Şoldăneşti, Vadul-Raşcov |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-30 - 2016-03-30
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
1997-04-09 - 2016-02-25
Teleneşti, Chiţcanii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-27 - 2016-02-29
Teleneşti, Chiţcanii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-25 - 2016-08-23
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-09 - 2016-04-06
Teleneşti, Mîndreşti |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-07 - 2016-04-19
Şoldăneşti, Olişcani |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-28 - 2016-04-28
Şoldăneşti, str. Tatarbunarilor, 25 |