Bars and other beverage serving activities
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1996-12-26 - 2015-08-12
Cahul, str. Libertăţii, 49 |
||
Administrator |
1994-06-01 - 2016-02-11
Cahul, Rumeanţev |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-12 - 2015-07-24
Cantemir, Cania |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-30 - 2015-08-10
Cantemir, Porumbeşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-28 - 2016-01-13
Cahul, str. Creangă Ion, 9 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-23 - 2015-10-29
Taraclia, str. Sovietică, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2015-11-27 - 2016-03-18
Cantemir, Vişniovca |
||
Administrator |
2015-12-24 - 2016-10-07
Cantemir, Cania |
||
Administrator |
2015-03-20 - 2016-04-04
Edineţ, str. Şoseaua Bucovina, 9, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-12 - 2015-07-13
Donduşeni, str. Vieru Igor, 108 |
||
Administrator |
2015-07-07 - 2016-06-13
Donduşeni, Scăieni |
||
Administrator |
2015-04-29 - 2016-01-19
Leova, Tomai |
||
Administrator |
2015-05-04 - 2016-04-28
Basarabeasca, str. Ukrainskaia, 46 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-08 - 2015-09-07
Cimişlia, Selemet |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-23 - 2015-11-25
Leova, Filipeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-27 - 2015-05-27
Şoldăneşti, Glinjeni |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-31 - 2015-06-24
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
2015-06-29 - 2016-11-07
Rezina, Păpăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-21 - 2015-07-03
Şoldăneşti, Găuzeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-18 - 2015-07-16
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-25 - 2015-07-28
Orhei, str. Osipenco, 28 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-26 - 2015-08-06
Şoldăneşti, Mihuleni |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-31 - 2015-09-02
Şoldăneşti, Răspopeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-04 - 2015-08-12
Şoldăneşti, str. 31 August, 4, ap.(of.) 209 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-27 - 2015-08-14
Şoldăneşti, Glinjeni |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-28 - 2015-08-14
Şoldăneşti, Cuşmirca |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-12 - 2015-09-22
Şoldăneşti, Glinjeni |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-15 - 2015-09-11
Şoldăneşti, Olişcani |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-17 - 2015-10-27
Orhei, str. Stejarilor, 2, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-30 - 2015-11-18
Teleneşti, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 25 |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-30 - 2015-11-23
Teleneşti, str. Coşbuc G., 6 |
||
Administrator |
2001-07-18 - 2015-11-18
Şoldăneşti, Şipca |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-04 - 2015-12-09
Şoldăneşti, Mihuleni |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-27 - 2015-12-22
Orhei, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 6, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-28 - 2015-11-30
Şoldăneşti, Sămăşcani |