Retail trade in stands and markets
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2005-04-01
Bălţi, str. 1 Mai, 5, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1998-09-15 - 2005-12-26
Sîngerei, Pepeni |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2006-04-04 - 2018-03-19
Bălţi, str. Decebal, 172, ap.(of.) 104 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-04
Bălţi, str. Testemiţeanu N., 19, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-21 - 1998-10-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doga Andrei, 32/2, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-08 - 2015-11-05
Bălţi, str. Chişinăului, 3 |
||
1997-06-26 - 2011-10-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 20, ap.(of.) 2 |
|||
Administrator |
1998-02-17
Rîşcani, Corlăteni |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-28 - 2016-06-09
Soroca, Bădiceni |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Petricani, 21/4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1992-12-31 - 2005-12-13
Bălţi, str. Calea Ieşilor, 47, ap.(of.) 207 |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-19
Bălţi, str. Victoriei bd., 98, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
2012-08-20
Orhei, Mîrzaci |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1997-01-17 - 2005-12-07
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 33, ap.(of.) 40 |
||
Administrator |
1992-11-06
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 64, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1993-11-02 - 2005-11-01
Bălţi, str. Strîi, 7, ap.(of.) 64 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1998-01-26 - 2005-12-27
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 118, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-29 - 2021-06-30
Rîşcani, str. Sf.Maria, 28 |
||
2000-07-07 - 2011-10-04
Bălţi, str. Suceava, 3, ap.(of.) 21 |
|||
Administrator |
2005-05-05
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 1, ap.(of.) 66 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-10 - 2006-06-22
Rîşcani, str. Independenţei, 57, ap.(of.) 31 |
||
1997-03-04 - 2011-10-04
Soroca, str. Muncii, 16 |
|||
Administrator Lichidator |
1996-08-28 - 2005-09-23
Bălţi, str. Hotin, 10, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-16
Bălţi, str. Lesecico Mihail, 6/A, ap.(of.) 51 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-28 - 2007-07-10
Bălţi, str. Independenţei, 32, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1999-06-29 - 2018-06-05
Hînceşti, Bozieni |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-27 - 2008-07-17
Sîngerei, Sîngereii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2005-06-01
Bălţi, str. 1 Mai, 7/A, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1997-09-09 - 2008-10-30
Bălţi, str. Mareşalului Malinovski, 7/21 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-24
Bălţi, str. Cicicalo Nicolai, 2 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2002-10-18 - 2016-06-13
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-24
Drochia, str. Sorocii şos., 22, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-19 - 2000-11-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 115, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-21 - 1999-12-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Puşkin A., 28, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-16 - 2002-06-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Odesa str-la 6, 4 |