Retail trade in stands and markets
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Lichidator Administrator |
1997-09-09 - 2009-09-09
Glodeni, Ustia |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1997-09-15 - 2009-09-09
Glodeni, str. Stamati C., 27 |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-08
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 162/1, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-28 - 2009-12-01
Glodeni, str. 300 ani Glodeni, 73 |
||
Administrator |
2009-10-23
Făleşti, Glinjeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-28 - 2017-05-31
UTA Găgăuzia, Congaz, str. Dnestrovscaia, 10 |
||
Administrator |
1993-05-25 - 2009-12-08
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 81/4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-15 - 2017-05-31
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Fedico, 19, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1997-04-17 - 2012-01-10
Anenii Noi, Todireşti |
||
Administrator |
1999-08-11 - 2017-09-04
Drochia, str. Libertăţii, 5/9 |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-23 - 2010-09-16
Făleşti, Călugăr |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-22 - 2018-07-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Drumul Viilor, 41, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-18 - 2017-09-04
Drochia, str. Sfatul Ţării, 38, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-27 - 2009-02-11
Cahul, Andruşul de Jos |
||
Administrator |
1997-09-24 - 2017-09-04
Drochia, str. Sorocii şos., 32/31 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-17
Cahul, str. Viteazul Mihai, 2, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-25 - 2012-06-13
Cahul, str. Lăutarilor, 78 |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-14
Drochia, str. Sfatul Ţării, 26, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-23
Taraclia, Tvardiţa, str. Ceapaev, 158 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-24 - 2018-03-12
Cahul, str. Horelor, 14, ap.(of.) 52 |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-02 - 2009-07-30
Cantemir, Cania, str. 31 August |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-17 - 2019-04-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Titulescu N., 39, ap.(of.) 70 |
||
Administrator |
1997-12-22 - 2020-03-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Codreanu Gheorghe, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2009-06-19 - 2011-09-22
Taraclia, str. Miciurin, 19 |
||
1993-03-23 - 2007-07-04
Criuleni, str. Victoriei, 18 |
|||
Administrator |
2009-09-10 - 2012-03-27
Cahul, str. Spirin Ivan, 92, ap.(of.) 41 |
||
Administrator |
2002-04-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 84, ap.(of.) 198 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-05 - 2017-09-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Doina şi Ion Aldea-Teodorovici, 14/2, ap.(of.) 31 |
||
Administrator |
2009-11-05
Cahul, str. Victoriei bd., 7/a |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-08 - 2023-10-05
Leova, str. Russo Alecu, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-22 - 2009-12-21
Cahul, str. Victoriei, 1 V |
||
Administrator |
1997-05-12 - 2009-01-21
Donduşeni, Corbu |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-10 - 2018-08-17
Criuleni, Corjova |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-01 - 2009-03-05
Briceni, Larga |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-07 - 2018-07-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Kiev, 4, ap.(of.) 3 |