Retail trade in stands and markets
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-07-05 - 2007-03-16
Soroca, Vasilcău |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-22 - 2007-03-16
Soroca, Vărăncău |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-19 - 2007-03-16
Soroca, Racovăţ |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-14 - 2007-03-16
Soroca, Slobozia-Cremene |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-16
Drochia, str. Sfatul Ţării, 30, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2003-04-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 204, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-15 - 2008-01-16
Floreşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 57, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1998-02-06 - 2007-04-18
Drochia, str. Cantemir D., 56 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-20 - 2009-06-02
Drochia, str. Romaniţei str-la, 30 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-19 - 2012-03-05
Drochia, str. Libertăţii, 5, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-19
Drochia, str. Independenţei, 83, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-23
Soroca, str. Luceafărul, 12, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1995-06-15 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Viilor, 5, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-02-11 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 136/2, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-05-18 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Şolohov M., 12 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1994-05-27 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Viilor, 2, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1995-06-15 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Teilor, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-11 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Costin Miron, 5 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1994-01-27 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Carpenco, 25 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1994-07-29 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, Vădeni |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-07-19 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Calea Bălţului, 80 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1994-07-04 - 2007-04-02
Soroca, str. Bolintineanu Dimitrie, 15, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1997-06-03 - 2017-02-20
Edineţ, Gordineşti |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-20 - 2007-09-26
Soroca, str. Studenţilor, 12/A, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-23 - 2007-06-29
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 113/1, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1994-10-18 - 2007-04-27
Soroca, Cosăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-24 - 2007-04-25
Soroca, str. Costin Miron, 5 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-29 - 2007-04-25
Soroca, str. Serii str-la, 20 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-13 - 2007-04-27
Soroca, Rubleniţa |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-07 - 2007-04-27
Soroca, Rubleniţa |
||
Administrator |
1994-06-15 - 2010-09-30
Soroca, Alexandru cel Bun |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1993-06-08 - 2007-04-28
Soroca, str. Luceafărul, 20, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1995-02-28 - 2007-04-28
Soroca, str. Levandovschi Iurie, 20, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1994-10-25 - 2007-06-11
Soroca, str. Soltîs Ion, 15 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1994-04-22 - 2007-05-31
Soroca, str. Soltuz N., 10, ap.(of.) 11 |