Other types of retail trade in specialized stores
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Lichidator Administrator |
2006-10-19 - 2013-11-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 15, ap.(of.) 75 |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-18 - 2016-02-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 105, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-09 - 2014-07-24
Bălţi, Sadovoe |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-15 - 2013-06-27
Făleşti, Răuţel |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-09 - 2018-12-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doina, 114, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2006-04-06 - 2016-10-06
Bălţi, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 45, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-20 - 2015-08-18
Rîşcani, Vasileuţi |
||
Administrator |
2006-09-19 - 2015-04-27
Sîngerei, Copăceni |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-13 - 2013-01-24
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 137/A |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-01 - 2015-11-17
Bălţi, str. 31 August, 22 |
||
Administrator |
2006-07-10 - 2015-03-31
Cahul, str. Strada Veche, 151, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
2006-09-19 - 2013-04-02
Taraclia, Sofievca |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-23 - 2015-01-06
Cahul, str. Şcheia şos., 20 |
||
Administrator |
2006-06-28 - 2015-01-16
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Chişinăului, 23, ap.(of.) 55 |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-01 - 2013-10-01
Edineţ, str. Crîngului, 22 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-19 - 2016-08-01
Leova, str. Varlaam, 14, ap.(of.) 457 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-19 - 2014-02-17
Orhei, str. Gorkii, 52 |
||
Administrator |
1998-09-30 - 2014-03-12
Orhei, str. Chişinăului str-la, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2006-06-02 - 2016-02-29
Şoldăneşti, Glinjeni |
||
Administrator |
2006-07-31 - 2014-02-13
Teleneşti, Cucioaia |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-06 - 2016-01-14
Şoldăneşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 33 |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-29 - 2015-05-25
Rezina, str. 27 August, 14, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2006-06-22 - 2017-01-31
Soroca, str. Soltuz N., 2, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-06 - 2014-10-06
Soroca, str. Independenţei, 79, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
2001-01-22 - 2019-09-11
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 88 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-06 - 2014-03-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Hânceşti şos., 74, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-26 - 2013-07-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Burebista, 36, ap.(of.) 41 |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-05 - 2015-02-02
Anenii Noi, Puhăceni |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-12 - 2015-10-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ghibu Onisifor, 4, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-26 - 2014-08-12
mun. Chişinău, Vatra, str. Calea Ghidighici, 1/A, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-23 - 2015-06-16
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Sadoveanu M., 154 |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-31 - 2017-05-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 125/1 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2007-08-14 - 2015-04-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 8/2, ap.(of.) 52 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-14 - 2017-04-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Basarab Matei, 2, ap.(of.) 70 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-18 - 2016-06-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 1/4, ap.(of.) 98 |