Retail trade in flowers, plants, seeds and fertilizers
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2007-03-26 - 2015-07-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 26/1 |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-28 - 2013-04-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Coloniţa, 151 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-26 - 2016-11-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 14/1, ap.(of.) 142 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-11 - 2015-11-24
mun. Chişinău, Sîngera, str. 31 August, 35 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-21 - 2013-02-06
Străşeni, str. Micle Veronica, 40, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-22 - 2013-02-18
Făleşti, str. Cozminului, 74 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-13 - 2013-07-17
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 1, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-01 - 2015-04-01
Cahul, str. Şolohov M., 20 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-01 - 2015-01-30
Cahul, str. Strada Veche, 7 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-28 - 2013-08-30
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Independenţei, 88 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-26 - 2015-03-25
Briceni, Corjeuţi |
||
Lichidator |
2007-12-17 - 2015-08-22
Donduşeni, str. Florilor, 44 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-23 - 2013-12-09
Hînceşti, Mereşeni |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-26 - 2013-04-10
Cimişlia, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfînt bd., 86 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-20 - 2015-05-25
Basarabeasca, str. Matrosov, 24 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-17 - 2015-11-18
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 96, ap.(of.) 67 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-10 - 2015-07-02
Basarabeasca, str. Gogol, 14, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-31 - 2014-02-18
Soroca, Căinarii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
1999-12-10 - 2020-11-23
Bălţi, str. Lesecico Mihail, 18, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-14 - 2016-04-15
Ungheni, str. Fîntînilor, 59 |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-19 - 2013-11-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vlahuţă Al., 5, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2008-05-12 - 2015-03-02
Bălţi, str. Vlaicu Aurel, 1, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-17 - 2013-12-17
Taraclia, str. Lenin, 108 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-18 - 2016-11-10
Cahul, str. Spirin Ivan, 100, ap.(of.) 63 |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-25 - 2015-08-07
Orhei, Brăviceni |
||
Administrator |
2008-05-13 - 2015-09-15
Ungheni, Sculeni |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-13 - 2013-10-28
Criuleni, Oniţcani |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-20 - 2017-04-20
mun. Chişinău, Băcioi, str. Creangă Ion, 11 |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-11 - 2016-03-18
Criuleni, Boşcana |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-16 - 2014-07-08
Făleşti, str. Suveranităţii, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-17 - 2015-06-25
Făleşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 141, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2009-07-15 - 2014-06-30
Bălţi, str. Academician Lazăr Dubinovschi, 69 |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-30 - 2015-12-29
Hînceşti, Drăguşeni |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-11 - 2018-12-28
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 116 |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-13 - 2015-09-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Balcani şos., 4/1, ap.(of.) 8 |