Retail trade of cleaning products, wallpapers and floor coverings, including cork boards
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2009-06-01 - 2019-12-17
Leova, Iargara, str. Negruzzi C., 10 |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-02 - 2019-12-16
Drochia, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 19, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-10 - 2020-12-16
Orhei, Tabăra |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1996-07-24
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 91, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-07 - 2021-03-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 21 |
||
Administrator |
2009-11-30 - 2020-02-26
Edineţ, Brătuşeni |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-17
Nisporeni, Vărzăreşti |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-30 - 2019-12-19
Străşeni, Recea |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-18 - 2020-12-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 5, ap.(of.) 252 |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-18 - 2019-12-19
Şoldăneşti, str. Neaga Şt., 31 |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-09 - 2022-03-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Repin Ilia, 6, ap.(of.) 3,4 |
||
Administrator |
2003-03-04 - 2013-06-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 784, ap.(of.) 98 |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-05 - 2019-12-20
Şoldăneşti, str. Păcii, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-25 - 2019-12-20
Şoldăneşti, str. Păcii, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-20 - 2013-06-27
Teleneşti, Ineşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-10 - 2015-11-05
Ungheni, str. Stere C., 16 |
||
Administrator |
2011-11-02 - 2019-12-23
Nisporeni, Bălăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-27 - 2020-12-18
Edineţ, Gordineşti |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-19 - 2019-12-26
Străşeni, Sireţi |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2009-05-05 - 2019-12-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 14, ap.(of.) 66 |
||
Administrator |
2010-12-27
Nisporeni, str. Victoriei, 68 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-11 - 2019-12-26
Cimişlia, str. Decebal, 40 |
||
Administrator |
2007-08-29 - 2019-12-26
Şoldăneşti, str. Livezilor, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2011-01-20 - 2019-12-26
Orhei, Mitoc |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-18 - 2019-12-26
Rezina, str. 27 August, 20, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2013-03-19 - 2019-12-27
mun. Chişinău, Ciorescu, str. Moldova, 3, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-14
Nisporeni, Marinici |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2014-12-09
Cantemir, Vişniovca |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-24 - 2019-12-30
Rezina, Ţipova |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-11 - 2019-12-30
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 2, ap.(of.) 64 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-30 - 2021-03-24
Briceni, str. Turghenev, 55 |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-25 - 2023-01-11
Cimişlia, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 49 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-07-27 - 2020-01-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 22, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-24 - 2015-11-13
Cantemir, str. Trandafirilor, 5, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
2005-04-29 - 2015-11-19
mun. Chişinău, Băcioi |