Retail trade of cleaning products, wallpapers and floor coverings, including cork boards
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
1998-06-05 - 2010-12-31
mun. Chişinău, Coloniţa |
|||
Lichidator Administrator |
2006-01-26 - 2020-12-10
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 5, ap.(of.) 89A |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-05 - 2020-02-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 25/6, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-21 - 2019-11-29
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2010-11-03 - 2021-03-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 13, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-20 - 2023-04-04
Sîngerei, Rădoaia |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-20 - 2015-08-04
Cantemir, Toceni |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-15 - 2015-08-10
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 42, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-09 - 2019-12-03
Orhei, str. Fîntînilor, 18 |
||
2002-10-22 - 2010-05-17
Hînceşti, Fundul Galbenei |
|||
Administrator |
2013-02-28 - 2019-12-03
Edineţ, Volodeni |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-18 - 2020-02-24
Căuşeni, str. Mateevici A., 13 |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-18 - 2022-03-23
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 120/A, ap.(of.) 83 |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-02 - 2020-02-24
Ştefan Vodă, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 32 |
||
Administrator |
2006-07-14 - 2020-12-11
Ungheni, Petreşti |
||
Administrator |
2005-11-02 - 2024-04-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 63/3, ap.(of.) 68 |
||
Administrator |
2004-02-11 - 2023-12-01
Căuşeni, Tănătari |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-06 - 2020-12-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 17, ap.(of.) 54 |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-15 - 2023-10-20
Cimişlia, Gura Galbenei, str. Cantemir D., 15 |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-14 - 2022-03-24
Basarabeasca, Sadaclia, str. Gorkii, 147 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-12-12 - 2019-12-09
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
2005-05-16 - 2009-05-11
Orhei, Tabăra |
|||
2007-01-02 - 2009-02-24
Cahul, Slobozia Mare |
|||
2007-08-14 - 2009-02-03
Cahul, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 15, ap.(of.) 37 |
|||
Administrator |
1997-09-08 - 2015-09-09
Donduşeni, str. Vieru Igor, 91 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-29 - 2015-09-14
Şoldăneşti, Şestaci |
||
Administrator |
2003-01-15 - 2022-03-24
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 19/2, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
2003-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 13, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-27 - 2020-12-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 62/5, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
2006-09-11 - 2021-03-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Lvov str-la 6, 11, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2008-09-10 - 2019-12-12
Nisporeni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 5/A, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-18
Taraclia, Valea Perjei, str. Frunze M., 18 |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-21 - 2019-12-16
Ialoveni, Bardar |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2004-01-27 - 2019-12-16
Bălţi, str. 31 August, 63, ap.(of.) 50 |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-10 - 2019-12-17
Orhei, str. Renaşterii Naţionale, 33 |