Retail trade of cleaning products, wallpapers and floor coverings, including cork boards
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2003-09-03 - 2019-08-23
mun. Chişinău, Bubuieci, str. Grădinarilor, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2004-01-22 - 2019-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 49/2, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-18 - 2019-02-27
Orhei, Isacova |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-31 - 2019-03-01
Ialoveni, Ruseştii Noi |
||
2008-05-07 - 2010-09-21
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Livezilor, 16, ap.(of.) 3 |
|||
Lichidator |
2007-01-29 - 2022-03-18
Grigoriopol, Taşlîc |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-13 - 2019-03-05
Orhei, str. Dacilor, 16 |
||
Administrator |
1994-06-05 - 2019-05-28
Sîngerei, Bursuceni |
||
Administrator |
2010-05-19 - 2021-03-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 15/1, ap.(of.) 75 |
||
Administrator |
2011-04-05 - 2019-03-11
Orhei, str. 31 August str-la 2, 9 |
||
Administrator |
2003-12-23 - 2017-04-19
Călăraşi, Horodişte |
||
Administrator provizoriu Administrator |
2015-02-10 - 2024-05-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mioriţa, 56 |
||
Administrator |
2004-03-27
Orhei, Hulboaca |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-13 - 2019-03-15
Cantemir, Victorovca |
||
Administrator |
2010-12-16 - 2019-03-15
Edineţ, Burlăneşti |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2009-08-26 - 2021-03-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 198 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-01-25 - 2019-09-26
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Matcovschi, 22 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2012-09-21 - 2019-03-18
Orhei, str. Cupcea V., 9, ap.(of.) 37 |
||
Administrator |
2010-09-29 - 2019-03-19
Edineţ, Burlăneşti |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2014-10-23
Anenii Noi, Floreni, str. Chişinăului, 9, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-16 - 2020-02-18
Ungheni, Boghenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2007-08-01 - 2019-03-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 49/1, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-06-16 - 2019-10-02
Ialoveni, str. Glavan Boris, 4/2 |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-06 - 2021-03-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 5/2, ap.(of.) 50 |
||
Administrator |
2014-08-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 112 |
||
Administrator |
2004-04-21
Criuleni, Coşerniţa |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-17 - 2020-02-19
Hînceşti, Boghiceni |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-20 - 2016-08-16
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 38, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
2006-12-28 - 2019-10-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 5/3, ap.(of.) 88 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-08 - 2019-10-04
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Haiducilor, 27 |
||
2005-03-22 - 2010-11-19
Teleneşti, str. Rareş Petru, 1, ap.(of.) 31 |
|||
Administrator |
2005-04-18 - 2020-02-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Cupcea V., 25/A |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2008-02-06 - 2019-10-07
Şoldăneşti, str. Soltîs Ion, 9 |
||
Administrator |
2003-01-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 1/2 |
||
Administrator |
2014-06-11 - 2019-10-08
Dubăsari, Pîrîta |