Retail trade of cleaning products, wallpapers and floor coverings, including cork boards
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2006-10-09 - 2021-03-11
Făleşti, Albineţul Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2011-07-20 - 2013-01-09
Ungheni, Cornova |
||
Administrator |
2011-10-05 - 2012-10-11
Călăraşi, str. Bojole, 25, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-08 - 2012-12-19
Anenii Noi, Gura Bîcului, str. 1 Mai, 13 |
||
Administrator |
2012-04-04 - 2012-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 19, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-11 - 2012-08-07
Teleneşti, Băneşti |
||
Administrator |
2012-05-24
Ungheni, Agronomovca |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-26 - 2012-09-06
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 12, ap.(of.) 516 |
||
Administrator |
2009-11-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doina, 201 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-07 - 2016-08-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 53/3, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
2010-04-23 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 13, ap.(of.) 193 |
||
Administrator |
2003-03-10 - 2013-01-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 2, ap.(of.) 156 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-01 - 2013-01-09
Ocniţa, Lipnic |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-30 - 2018-12-21
Briceni, Berlinţi |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-30 - 2018-11-09
Edineţ, Hincăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-06 - 2018-11-09
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 22, ap.(of.) 38 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2009-12-10 - 2021-12-28
Rezina, Ciorna, str. Cantemir D., 19 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-20 - 2020-10-29
Drochia, str. Ghica-Vodă, 31A |
||
Administrator |
2010-07-21 - 2013-01-28
Ocniţa, Mereşeuca |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-03 - 2013-03-26
Edineţ, str. Pescarilor, 37 |
||
Administrator |
2010-09-09 - 2013-02-15
Briceni, str. Livezilor, 3 |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-25 - 2020-10-29
Teleneşti, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-09 - 2020-10-29
Şoldăneşti, Chipeşca |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2009-05-08 - 2022-09-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Hristo Botev, 25, ap.(of.) 118 |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-06 - 2018-12-24
Orhei, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 4, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Întreprinzător Individual IOVU OLEG Lichidator Administrator |
2004-06-07 - 2016-06-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 5, ap.(of.) 102 |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-15 - 2020-11-20
Şoldăneşti, Pohoarna |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-02 - 2024-04-29
Leova, str. Costin Miron, 11, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
2004-12-09 - 2014-10-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 7, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
2004-12-22 - 2014-05-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doina, 104/2, ap.(of.) 42 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-08 - 2013-07-04
Briceni, Criva |
||
Administrator |
2009-11-24 - 2013-12-18
Edineţ, Feteşti |
||
Administrator |
2009-10-22 - 2013-03-22
Ungheni, Boghenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2009-11-10 - 2013-12-24
Călăraşi, Bahmut |
||
Administrator |
2010-07-28 - 2013-11-25
Nisporeni, Bărboieni |