Retail trade of cleaning products, wallpapers and floor coverings, including cork boards
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-10-29 - 2021-11-22
Orhei, str. Iachir, 19, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2006-02-07 - 2021-11-23
Teleneşti, Ineşti |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-29 - 2023-04-03
Teleneşti, Chiştelniţa |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-16 - 2021-11-25
Călăraşi, str. Daneză, 9 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 39, ap.(of.) 130 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-06 - 2021-11-25
Călăraşi, Nişcani |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2015-02-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Pandurilor, 16, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-26 - 2022-05-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mioriţa, 5/2, ap.(of.) 54 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-25
Donduşeni, str. Cantemir D., 26 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-17
Briceni, Criva |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-18
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 124 |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-08 - 2018-02-26
Edineţ, str. Sîrbu Elena, 18 |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Titulescu Nicolae, 1, ap.(of.) 189 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ureche Gr., 55, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-28 - 2019-08-13
Dubăsari, Coşniţa |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-07
Orhei, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-13
Orhei, Brăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-08
Nisporeni, Cristeşti |
||
Administrator |
2004-02-05
Cahul, Roşu, str. Mănăstirii, 6 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-20
Călăraşi, Novaci |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-04
Leova, Tigheci |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-03
Orhei, Ciocîlteni |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-02 - 2019-08-13
Orhei, Ciocîlteni |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-18 - 2019-08-13
Şoldăneşti, str. Păcii, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2013-08-22 - 2022-07-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 26/3, ap.(of.) 149 |
||
Lichidator |
2008-01-18 - 2018-02-28
Ungheni, str. Cibotari Maria, 88, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-14 - 2023-10-16
Rezina, Ciorna, str. Malarciuc G., 19 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-08 - 2018-10-05
Nisporeni, str. Victoriei, 54 |
||
Administrator |
2005-03-28 - 2018-12-19
Orhei, Mitoc |
||
Lichidator |
2006-07-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Coşbuc G., 11, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
2011-07-22 - 2019-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 48, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-28 - 2019-08-14
mun. Chişinău, Cricova, str. Cantemir D., 39 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-25 - 2018-10-04
Nisporeni, Bălăureşti |
||
Administrator |
1993-09-02 - 2018-10-04
Nisporeni, Şişcani |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-06 - 2021-12-03
Şoldăneşti, Fuzăuca |