Retail trade of cleaning products, wallpapers and floor coverings, including cork boards
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2010-08-18 - 2019-02-04
Nisporeni, Bolţun |
||
Administrator |
2003-10-17 - 2008-06-11
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 123, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
2010-10-05
Hînceşti, Bozieni |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 188/2, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
2011-12-13
Hînceşti, str. Sfînta Treime, 6/A |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-12
Cahul, str. Cibotari Maria, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2003-04-03
Briceni, str. Fierarilor, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2004-06-04
Hînceşti, Stolniceni |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-01 - 2007-06-06
Edineţ, str. Izvoarelor, 46 |
||
Administrator |
1992-06-11
Briceni, str. Prietenia, 33 |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-22 - 2020-04-17
Hînceşti, str. Comisarul Mihai Moraru, 66 |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-05 - 2020-04-17
Hînceşti, Logăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-24 - 2020-04-17
Hînceşti, Căţeleni |
||
Administrator |
2004-07-23 - 2019-11-28
Hînceşti, Nemţeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-08
Hînceşti, str. Sadoveanu M., 5, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-23 - 2019-11-28
Hînceşti, str. Bozienilor şos., 1 |
||
Administrator |
2014-11-12 - 2019-11-28
Hînceşti, Feteasca |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-16 - 2017-11-14
Cantemir, str. Marinescu Al., 1 |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-11
Şoldăneşti, Cotiujenii Mari |
||
Administrator |
2009-07-07 - 2020-04-17
Hînceşti, Dubovca |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2013-01-26 - 2017-11-14
mun. Chişinău, Cricova, str. Rediului, 6 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-12 - 2021-02-22
Teleneşti, Ciulucani |
||
Administrator |
2005-03-24
Rezina, str. Sfîntul Ilie, 9 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-14
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2007-08-14 - 2020-02-04
Cimişlia, Lipoveni |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-15 - 2008-02-14
Orhei, str. 1 Mai, 26 |
||
Administrator |
2002-09-06
Şoldăneşti, Găuzeni |
||
Administrator |
2001-09-10
Orhei, Lucăşeuca |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-14
Orhei, Lucăşeuca |
||
Administrator |
2003-12-03 - 2007-01-17
Orhei, Ghetlova |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-18 - 2014-11-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 22/3, ap.(of.) 91 |
||
Administrator |
2015-02-17
Ungheni, Boghenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-25 - 2020-10-16
Donduşeni, str. Gangal Vasile, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-29 - 2014-03-20
Ocniţa, str. Gagarin Iu., 95 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Pădurii, 13 |