Retail trade of cleaning products, wallpapers and floor coverings, including cork boards
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2013-01-29
Călăraşi, Buda |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-11
Nisporeni, str. Industrială, 1, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-11
Ungheni, Bumbăta |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-16
Ungheni, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 1, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-23
Călăraşi, Peticeni |
||
Administrator |
2013-06-04
Nisporeni, Bălăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2013-06-28
Ungheni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 176/A |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-11
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 5, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
2013-09-17
Nisporeni, str. Viilor, 38 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-02 - 2018-01-29
Briceni, Trebisăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-26 - 2011-04-06
Teleneşti, Coropceni |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-29 - 2023-02-27
Orhei, Cişmea |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-14 - 2019-11-06
Călăraşi, str. Creangă Ion, 22, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-19
Cahul, str. Murafa Simion, 2 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2003-10-13 - 2024-01-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ismail, 100/2, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2005-04-26 - 2011-04-14
Cantemir, Alexandrovca |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-09
Briceni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 8, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
2006-06-30 - 2019-04-10
Dubăsari, Molovata Nouă |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-22
Briceni, Tabani |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-30
Ungheni, Sculeni |
||
Administrator |
2009-10-14 - 2018-03-23
Hînceşti, Buţeni |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-03 - 2017-12-28
Orhei, Pohorniceni |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Suceviţa, 22/2, ap.(of.) 54 |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-12 - 2011-05-30
Hînceşti, str. Comisarul Mihai Moraru, 77 |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 7/3, ap.(of.) 129 |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2013-11-14
Străşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-14
Soroca, Vasilcău |
||
Administrator |
2009-06-24 - 2023-12-26
Criuleni, Cruglic |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-24
Străşeni, Codreanca |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2004-08-11
Orhei, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 6, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-02 - 2021-10-22
Şoldăneşti, Pohoarna |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-24 - 2014-05-21
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Korceaghin Pavel, 18, ap.(of.) 38 |
||
Lichidator |
2009-05-12
Ungheni, str. Sadoveanu M., 4 |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-03
Rezina, Pecişte |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-20 - 2021-10-22
Orhei, str. Pelivan Ion, 24 |