|
|
1998-04-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 20, ap.(of.) 4
|
|
|
|
1998-04-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 23, ap.(of.) 122
|
|
|
|
1998-04-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 16/1, ap.(of.) 40
|
|
|
|
2011-07-18
Anenii Noi, Geamăna
|
|
|
|
1998-05-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Botanica Veche, 10, ap.(of.) 46
|
|
|
|
1998-06-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 31/3, ap.(of.) 37
|
|
|
|
1998-06-15
mun. Chişinău, Dobrogea, str. Dobruşa, 11
|
|
|
|
1998-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 28/5, ap.(of.) 39
|
|
|
|
1998-09-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 5, ap.(of.) 188
|
|
|
|
1998-12-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 32/B, ap.(of.) 412
|
|
|
|
1999-03-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 16, ap.(of.) 130
|
|
|
|
2002-03-14 - 2021-09-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Zadnipru P., 14/1, ap.(of.) 42
|
|
|
|
1999-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 16, ap.(of.) 83
|
|
|
|
1999-05-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Valea Crucii, 22, ap.(of.) 147
|
|
|
|
1999-06-02 - 1999-08-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 54, ap.(of.) 8
|
|
|
|
1999-06-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 33/1, ap.(of.) 142
|
|
|
|
1999-12-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 50, ap.(of.) 49
|
|
|
|
1999-08-10 - 2018-01-31
Ungheni, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 15, ap.(of.) 84
|
|
|
|
2014-03-19 - 2020-01-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Doctor Tudor Strişca, 10
|
|
|
|
2001-09-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 37/1, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
1997-06-23 - 2018-07-26
Ungheni, str. Feroviară, 27, ap.(of.) 51
|
|
|
|
2014-06-26 - 2020-01-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Sihastrului, 38
|
|
|
|
1993-01-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Basarab Matei, 7/3, ap.(of.) 35
|
|
|
|
1992-12-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 61/2, ap.(of.) 175
|
|
|
|
2002-02-18 - 2021-09-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 32
|
|
|
|
2001-11-26 - 2020-09-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 11
|
|
|
|
2012-02-16
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Matrosov, 24
|
|
|
|
1993-03-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Şciusev A., 111
|
|
|
|
1994-03-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 5/2, ap.(of.) 3
|
|
|
|
1994-03-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lazo S., 48
|
|
|
|
1994-10-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Neculce Ion, 12/1, ap.(of.) 12
|
|
|
|
2008-04-23 - 2020-01-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Gogol, 31/5, ap.(of.) 11
|
|
|
|
2009-08-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mioriţa, 7/1, ap.(of.) 10
|
|
|
|
1995-07-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni Gavril, 23, ap.(of.) 2
|
|
|
|
2007-12-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Acad. Saharov, 2, ap.(of.) 6
|
|