Retail trade of blacksmiths' articles, paints and glass
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1994-12-09 - 2021-06-15
Călăraşi, str. Lupu Vasile, 53 |
||
Administrator |
2010-05-03 - 2021-06-15
Bălţi |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-04-01
Bălţi, str. Strîi, 7, ap.(of.) 62 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2009-01-12
Leova, Cneazevca |
||
Administrator |
2006-09-05 - 2021-06-17
Glodeni, Ciuciulea |
||
Administrator |
2000-11-29 - 2021-06-16
Edineţ, Buzdugeni |
||
Administrator |
1998-11-02 - 2021-06-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Doina şi Ion Aldea-Teodorovici, 11/1 |
||
Administrator |
2004-12-02 - 2021-06-18
Rîşcani, Nihoreni, str. Lermontov M., 170 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-09-27 - 2021-06-21
Bălţi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2001-12-28 - 2021-06-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Buiucani, 4, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
1999-01-21 - 2021-06-24
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Korceaghin Pavel, 46 |
||
Administrator |
2010-06-30 - 2021-06-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Academiei, 4, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
2002-03-18 - 2005-04-01
Cantemir, Chioselia |
||
Administrator |
2004-03-24 - 2021-06-24
Glodeni, str. 300 ani Glodeni, 125 |
||
Administrator |
2001-05-18 - 2021-06-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 23, ap.(of.) 249 |
||
Administrator |
1999-08-25 - 2023-12-29
Edineţ, str. Zăbricenilor, 2 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2005-11-09 - 2021-06-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Uzinelor, 47 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2008-02-29
Bălţi, str. Decebal, 164, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-22 - 2021-06-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Topârceanu George, 27, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
2004-01-12 - 2022-10-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Kiev, 4, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-10 - 2021-06-29
Călăraşi, str. Bojole str-la 3, 11 |
||
Administrator |
2011-12-12 - 2021-06-29
mun. Chişinău, Truşeni, str. Ghidighici, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-08 - 2022-07-04
Ialoveni, str. Viteazul Mihai, 74 |
||
Administrator |
2004-12-08 - 2022-05-17
Bălţi, str. Ceapaev str-la, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-09 - 2022-05-18
Sîngerei, Ţipleşti |
||
Administrator |
2004-11-12
Cahul, str. 31 August, 13/V/1 |
||
Administrator |
2005-10-26 - 2022-10-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Coşbuc G., 30, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-06 - 2022-10-07
Cahul, Văleni |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-20
Cimişlia, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 135, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1998-11-24 - 2022-05-17
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 165 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-19 - 2024-04-08
Cimişlia, str. Cetatea Albă, 41 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2005-05-26
Criuleni, str. Mioriţa, 64 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2005-03-09
Bălţi, str. Victoriei bd., 51 |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-31 - 2022-05-19
Bălţi, str. Alecsandri Vasile piaţa, 4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2012-04-06 - 2022-05-19
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Costin Nicolae H., 57, ap.(of.) 62 |