Retail trade of household electrical articles and appliances and radios
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2003-11-06 - 2019-01-02
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 126, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
1999-08-19 - 2013-02-12
Căuşeni, str. Pietre Vechi, 17 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-21 - 2013-09-27
Ştefan Vodă, Slobozia |
||
Administrator |
2013-08-01 - 2013-08-22
Ştefan Vodă, Copceac, str. Tineretului, 23 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-26 - 2013-05-23
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lazo S., 38 |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-21 - 2019-01-02
Sîngerei, Dobrogea Veche |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-28 - 2016-08-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 40/2, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
2014-06-12 - 2015-12-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Ceucari, 2/6, ap.(of.) 53 |
||
Administrator |
2002-01-16 - 2014-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Albişoara, 84/1, ap.(of.) 69 |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-22 - 2015-09-16
Glodeni, str. Decebal, 68, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-24 - 2015-05-21
Bălţi, str. Coroban Vasile, 22, ap.(of.) 16 |
||
Administrator |
2004-07-13 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 184, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
2004-07-21 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Humuleşti, 21 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-05 - 2016-12-23
Cimişlia, Porumbrei |
||
Administrator |
1997-06-20 - 2015-04-30
Orhei, Ocniţa-Răzeşi |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-27 - 2015-11-27
Ştefan Vodă, Volintiri, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 96 |
||
Administrator |
2014-09-16 - 2016-08-26
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August, 11, ap.(of.) 65 |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-14 - 2015-11-05
Nisporeni, str. Ioan Vodă, 44 |
||
Administrator |
2014-09-01 - 2015-10-20
Nisporeni, str. Unirii, 16 |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-10 - 2015-01-12
UTA Găgăuzia, Dezghingea, str. Nekrasov, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-08 - 2015-08-04
Anenii Noi, str. 8 Martie, 31 |
||
Administrator |
1999-02-18 - 2015-08-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 14, ap.(of.) 64 |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-24 - 2019-01-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Socoleni, 11/1, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2006-06-28 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 49/3, ap.(of.) 54 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-23 - 2015-07-22
Bălţi, str. Moldoviţa, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-18 - 2015-10-06
Rîşcani, str. Frunze M., 35 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-13 - 2016-01-04
Sîngerei, str. Asachi Gh., C, ap.(of.) S 2 |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-04 - 2020-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Nistor Ion, 4, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-28 - 2015-12-01
Drochia, Pelinia |
||
Administrator |
2015-01-27 - 2015-03-16
Căuşeni, Cîrnăţeni |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-24 - 2015-10-06
Căuşeni, Tănătarii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-25 - 2015-02-27
Nisporeni, Vărzăreşti |
||
Administrator |
2000-08-29 - 2015-07-09
Ungheni, Măcăreşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-31 - 2017-03-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 17, ap.(of.) 213 |
||
Administrator |
1998-09-08 - 2017-03-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 59/3, ap.(of.) 57 |