Retail trade of footwear and leather goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Lichidator Administrator |
2001-12-19 - 2015-06-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfânt bd., 196, ap.(of.) etaj 2 |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-11 - 2015-04-15
Rezina, Cinişeuţi |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2005-08-29 - 2015-06-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Pajurii, 13, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2007-10-03 - 2015-04-10
Şoldăneşti, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-28 - 2015-07-07
Rîşcani, Mihăileni |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2010-07-02 - 2015-06-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Calea Orheiului, 105, ap.(of.) 72 |
||
Lichidator |
2011-07-01 - 2015-06-29
Criuleni, Boşcana |
||
Administrator |
2011-07-26 - 2015-06-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Sfânta Vineri, 16/A, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-03 - 2015-04-09
Cantemir, Cociulia |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2013-05-18 - 2015-05-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 10/3, ap.(of.) 74 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-02-04 - 2015-07-06
Orhei, str. Eminescu M., 10 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-30 - 2015-05-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Galaţan, 19 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-28 - 2015-06-25
Bălţi, str. Tuhacevski, 1, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-30 - 2020-06-17
Teleneşti, Mihălaşa |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1992-06-15 - 2015-08-10
Criuleni, Zolonceni |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2003-04-15 - 2015-08-25
Cahul, str. Spirin V., 94, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2000-04-17 - 2015-09-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 53, ap.(of.) 124 |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Columna, 58 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-28 - 2015-07-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 11, ap.(of.) 401 |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-11 - 2015-07-31
Făleşti, Glinjeni |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-18 - 2015-09-17
Orhei, str. Victoriei, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2011-06-16 - 2015-07-08
UTA Găgăuzia, Chirsova, str. 28 Iunie, 193 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2012-05-11 - 2015-07-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Burebista, 68/1, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Colina Puşkin, 14, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-24 - 2015-10-07
Cahul, Slobozia Mare, str. 31 August |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-30 - 2020-06-18
Orhei, Mitoc |
||
Administrator |
2014-08-01 - 2020-06-18
Teleneşti, Crăsnăşeni |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-06 - 2023-12-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Cikalov V., 13 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-06-26 - 2021-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădina Botanică, 14/3, ap.(of.) 307 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-02 - 2011-09-22
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Matrosov, 6/A, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-11 - 2011-09-07
UTA Găgăuzia, Svetlîi, str. Lazo S., 19 |
||
Administrator |
2008-12-03 - 2011-09-21
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Korceaghin Pavel, 13, ap.(of.) 59 |
||
Administrator |
2010-02-24 - 2011-08-25
Edineţ, Trinca |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-05 - 2011-12-06
Briceni, str. Frunze M., 40 |
||
Administrator |
2009-08-21 - 2011-12-01
Ocniţa, Lipnic |