Retail trade of cosmetics and perfumery, toiletries
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2010-06-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 16/3, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1995-04-12 - 2024-01-02
Bălţi, str. Porumbescu Ciprian, 63 |
||
Administrator |
2015-02-16
Bălţi, str. Libertăţii, 5, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
2005-09-28 - 2023-02-02
Ocniţa, Grinăuţi-Moldova |
||
Administrator |
2002-01-30 - 2023-02-03
Ungheni, Valea Mare |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2010-08-19 - 2023-11-07
Străşeni, Vorniceni, str. Ştefan cel Mare |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-20 - 2023-11-07
Rîşcani, Gălăşeni |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-27 - 2023-02-08
Rezina, Ţareuca |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-23 - 2023-02-01
Criuleni, Hruşova |
||
Administrator |
2001-06-14 - 2023-02-03
Cahul, str. Republicii bd., 16, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2003-02-03 - 2023-02-03
Bălţi, str. Tuhacevski, 9, ap.(of.) 46 |
||
Administrator |
2006-08-09 - 2023-02-03
Orhei, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-04 - 2023-11-07
Anenii Noi, Mereni |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-03-31 - 2023-07-03
Bălţi, str. Ceapaev, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2007-08-10
Taraclia, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 63A |
||
Administrator |
2010-05-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 9, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
2001-05-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 75/15 |
||
Administrator |
2004-02-26 - 2023-02-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 29, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-09-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Lupu Vasile, 27 |
||
Administrator |
2013-06-27
Ialoveni |
||
Administrator |
2012-01-12 - 2023-02-09
Rezina, str. 27 August, 44, ap.(of.) 31 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-11 - 2023-02-09
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Korceaghin Pavel, 10, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-15 - 2023-02-10
Cahul, Crihana Veche |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1997-11-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vadul lui Vodă, 44, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-28 - 2023-05-23
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 93/a |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-18 - 2023-02-10
Căuşeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfînt str-la 9, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-24 - 2023-02-14
Ocniţa, str. Luceafărul, 44 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-17 - 2023-02-14
Rezina, str. 1 Mai, 15, ap.(of.) 57 |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Grenoble, 159/4, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator |
2010-09-29
mun. Chişinău, Ghidighici, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 41 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-23 - 2023-02-15
Căuşeni, Tănătari |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-12
Criuleni, str. Biruinţei bd., 14 |
||
Administrator |
2004-08-24 - 2023-03-01
Rezina, Pecişte |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-13
Rezina, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 51, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-16 - 2023-11-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Mirceşti, 8/1, ap.(of.) 36 |