Retail trade of cosmetics and perfumery, toiletries
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2002-03-06 - 2022-11-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 84/3, ap.(of.) 91 |
||
Administrator |
2011-08-11 - 2022-11-02
Cimişlia, Mihailovca, str. Eminescu Mihai, 279 |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-02 - 2022-11-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 26/3A, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2010-01-25 - 2022-11-02
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 120/a |
||
Administrator |
2005-03-16
Şoldăneşti, Cobîlea, str. <, 1 |
||
Administrator |
2002-03-15 - 2022-11-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 22, ap.(of.) 42 |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-04 - 2023-05-22
Ialoveni, Costeşti, str. Decebal, 18 |
||
Lichidator |
1993-10-11 - 2023-06-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 61 |
||
Administrator |
2009-08-24 - 2022-11-04
Călăraşi, Sadova |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2008-02-19 - 2022-11-07
mun. Chişinău, Coloniţa, str. Tohatin, 28 |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-12 - 2022-11-07
mun. Chişinău, Goianul Nou, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 40 |
||
Administrator |
2010-09-22 - 2022-11-07
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Doina, 84/A |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-11
Teleneşti, Brînzenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2013-08-15
Briceni, Bogdăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2010-10-08 - 2022-11-08
Ungheni, Pîrliţa |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2010-02-23 - 2022-11-08
Rîşcani, Sverdiac |
||
Administrator |
2014-08-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Balcani şos., 8, ap.(of.) 106 |
||
Administrator |
2004-04-15 - 2022-11-08
Străşeni, Chirianca |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-01 - 2022-11-10
Căuşeni, Căinari, str. Creangă Ion, 6 |
||
Administrator |
2004-11-11 - 2024-01-18
Orhei, Berezlogi |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-09
Floreşti, Vărvăreuca |
||
Lichidator |
2008-07-17 - 2023-11-01
Rîşcani, Pîrjota |
||
Administrator |
2003-12-08
Cahul, str. Frunze M., 50, ap.(of.) 68 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-18 - 2023-02-03
Rîşcani, str. Glavan Boris, 5, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator |
2004-11-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 34, ap.(of.) 82 |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Maiorescu Titu, 6, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-05-12 - 2023-05-19
Cantemir, Sadîc |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-21 - 2022-12-09
Cahul, str. Mircea cel Bătrîn, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-06 - 2022-12-09
Făleşti, Ciolacu Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-11 - 2023-06-30
Rezina, str. Basarabia, 2, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
2000-12-07 - 2022-12-08
Cahul, Borceag |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-20 - 2023-08-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 15 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-03 - 2018-04-11
Bălţi, str. Tiraspol, 3, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2001-12-18
mun. Chişinău, Tohatin |
||
Administrator |
2011-01-13 - 2022-12-13
Criuleni, Măgdăceşti |