Retail trade of cosmetics and perfumery, toiletries
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2006-03-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Columna, 58 |
||
Administrator Lichidator Administrator |
2006-09-22 - 2015-09-14
Bălţi, str. Kolesov Ivan, 4, ap.(of.) 60 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-09 - 2015-09-22
Orhei, Ivancea |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-28 - 2015-07-31
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 11, ap.(of.) 401 |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-14 - 2015-09-22
Bălţi, str. Şciusev A., 9, ap.(of.) 26 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2008-12-25 - 2015-07-30
Cahul, str. Dacilor, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2010-01-11 - 2015-10-12
Cantemir, Lărguţa |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-28 - 2015-09-17
Ocniţa, str. Burebista, 46, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2010-03-15 - 2015-08-19
Ştefan Vodă, Carahasani, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 21 |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-18 - 2015-08-04
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 21, ap.(of.) 50 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Colina Puşkin, 14, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2012-05-10 - 2015-09-09
Rîşcani, Corlăteni, str. Musicescu G., 5 |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-24 - 2015-10-07
Cahul, Slobozia Mare, str. 31 August |
||
Administrator |
1998-11-11 - 2015-08-12
Bălţi, str. Calea Ieşilor, 106, ap.(of.) 42 |
||
Administrator |
2001-10-24
Cantemir, Ciobalaccia |
||
Administrator |
1999-10-20 - 2020-06-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 53/3, ap.(of.) 67 |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-16 - 2020-06-18
Rezina, str. 27 August, 12, ap.(of.) 36 |
||
Administrator |
2014-08-01 - 2020-06-18
Teleneşti, Crăsnăşeni |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-21
Cimişlia, Albina |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-06-26 - 2021-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădina Botanică, 14/3, ap.(of.) 307 |
||
Administrator |
2001-08-21
Anenii Noi, Geamăna |
||
Administrator |
2009-11-23 - 2011-03-22
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Rumeanţev P., 5, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-25 - 2011-06-02
Cahul, str. Păcii, 26, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-05 - 2011-12-06
Briceni, str. Frunze M., 40 |
||
Administrator |
2010-03-01 - 2011-02-02
Ungheni, Condrăteşti |
||
Administrator |
2009-07-21 - 2011-12-07
Călăraşi, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 56, ap.(of.) 57 |
||
Administrator |
2002-12-04 - 2011-06-08
Cahul, str. Sanatoriului, 10, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
2000-06-21 - 2011-08-17
Taraclia, Cairaclia, str. Parhomenko Alexandr, 33 |
||
Administrator |
2002-09-19 - 2011-12-21
Taraclia, str. Donskoi str-la, 7 |
||
Administrator |
2003-04-01 - 2011-05-13
Bălţi, str. Franco I., 10, ap.(of.) 48 |
||
2002-07-18 - 2011-12-14
Bălţi, str. Parhomenko Alexandr, 18 |
|||
Administrator |
1998-04-08 - 2015-12-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Pietrarilor, 13/A |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1997-08-26 - 2015-12-30
Bălţi, str. Feroviarilor, 2 |
||
Administrator |
2001-10-16 - 2015-12-16
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2003-07-11 - 2015-12-30
Bălţi, str. 31 August, 25 |