Retail trade of cosmetics and perfumery, toiletries
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2004-10-13 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Deleanu Liviu, 5/D |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-24 - 2014-07-17
Taraclia, Corten, str. Komsomolskaia, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-31 - 2016-05-19
Cahul, str. Griviţei şos., 9, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-07 - 2016-05-27
Taraclia, Tvardiţa, str. Lenin, 92 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-31 - 2015-02-11
Cahul, str. Seliviorstov Fiodor, 14, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-05 - 2020-02-17
Făleşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 95, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2014-09-09 - 2015-02-03
Donduşeni, Crişcăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2003-12-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 17, ap.(of.) 133 |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-30 - 2016-03-10
Hînceşti, str. Iorga Nicolae, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-17 - 2017-01-20
Şoldăneşti, str. Speranţei, 16 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-24 - 2015-04-14
Teleneşti, str. Renaşterii, 31 |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-01 - 2016-08-09
Teleneşti, Cucioaia |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-08 - 2015-08-25
Orhei, Mitoc |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-10 - 2015-05-15
Rezina, str. Şciusev A., 12, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-10 - 2015-09-22
Rezina, Mateuţi |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-15 - 2016-07-08
Teleneşti, str. Ion Vodă, 19/A, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator |
2014-07-17 - 2017-04-06
Orhei, str. Mîndru Mihail, 44 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-30 - 2015-12-10
Orhei, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-31 - 2016-06-16
Soroca, str. Stroescu V., 88/1, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-27 - 2016-07-11
Floreşti, Băhrineşti |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-25 - 2016-05-06
Ştefan Vodă, Ermoclia, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 95 |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-08 - 2015-03-24
Ştefan Vodă, Popeasca, str. Comsomolului, 87 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-20 - 2014-05-20
Căuşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 27, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-27 - 2015-11-27
Ştefan Vodă, Volintiri, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 96 |
||
Administrator |
2014-06-13 - 2016-09-20
Căuşeni, Cîrnăţenii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2014-09-16 - 2016-08-26
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August, 11, ap.(of.) 65 |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-20 - 2017-02-06
Ştefan Vodă, Slobozia |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-22 - 2014-10-30
Ştefan Vodă, Olăneşti, str. 31 August, 54 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-20 - 2017-01-26
Ungheni, Cetireni |
||
Administrator |
2000-02-24 - 2015-03-23
Criuleni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 54, ap.(of.) 41 |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-06 - 2015-05-20
Străşeni, str. Mateevici Alexei, 1, ap.(of.) 38 |
||
Administrator |
2000-05-15 - 2020-11-25
Leova, Sărata-Răzeşi |
||
Administrator |
2000-03-01 - 2015-07-07
Criuleni, Zăicana |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-25 - 2015-10-16
Anenii Noi, str. Glavan Boris, 12/A |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-17 - 2015-07-17
Anenii Noi, str. Livezilor, 17, ap.(of.) 1 |