Retail trade of cosmetics and perfumery, toiletries
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2006-06-16 - 2019-08-09
Orhei, Ciocîlteni |
||
Administrator |
2006-09-27 - 2019-08-09
Orhei, Cucuruzenii de Sus |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-03 - 2018-06-20
Sîngerei, str. Mioriţa, 16 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-13 - 2019-08-09
Orhei, str. Negruzzi C., 113, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-23 - 2019-08-09
Orhei, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-20 - 2019-08-09
Orhei, str. Negruzzi C., 113, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
2014-06-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Lvov str-la 2, 5 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2010-10-04 - 2019-08-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 200/5, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Administrator |
2001-06-13 - 2020-09-08
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Fedico, 22, ap.(of.) 36 |
||
Administrator |
2001-02-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Independenţei, 36, ap.(of.) 168 |
||
Administrator |
2010-05-05 - 2018-02-21
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 1, ap.(of.) 74 |
||
2001-08-09 - 2012-05-03
Făleşti, Scumpia |
|||
Administrator |
2014-11-20
Bălţi, str. Sofia str-la, 1, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator |
2006-05-10
Hînceşti, Cărpineni, str. Fodor Sergiu, 65 |
||
Administrator |
2003-11-07 - 2019-08-06
Ungheni, Petreşti |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-21 - 2016-03-28
Anenii Noi, Varniţa |
||
Administrator |
2014-09-18 - 2018-10-04
Orhei, str. Luceafărul, 47 |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-19 - 2021-11-22
Cantemir, Pleşeni |
||
Administrator |
1998-12-08
Slobozia, Sucleia, str. <, 47 |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-26 - 2021-11-22
Donduşeni, str. Suvorov A., 3 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-10-29 - 2021-11-22
Orhei, str. Iachir, 19, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2005-11-11 - 2020-02-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 2/2 |
||
Administrator |
2002-03-20 - 2024-04-10
Cantemir, Tartaul |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-28 - 2021-11-23
Anenii Noi, Hîrbovăţ |
||
Administrator |
2015-02-25 - 2021-11-23
Ialoveni, Văsieni |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-25 - 2021-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 45, ap.(of.) 82 |
||
Administrator |
2006-02-07 - 2021-11-23
Teleneşti, Ineşti |
||
Administrator |
2012-06-14 - 2021-11-23
Rîşcani, Ciubara |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-31 - 2021-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 46, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-24 - 2018-02-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 99/3, ap.(of.) 810g |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2007-06-22 - 2021-11-24
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Unirii Principatelor piaţa, 1, ap.(of.) 360 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-12 - 2021-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 1/1, ap.(of.) 143 |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-19
Taraclia, str. Cotovschi, 29, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1993-10-04 - 2022-02-24
Cahul, str. Asachi Gh., 26 |
||
Administrator |
2009-10-15 - 2021-03-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 49, ap.(of.) 45 |