Retail trade of meat and meat products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2008-07-31 - 2020-12-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Pietrarilor, 14, ap.(of.) 29 |
||
Administrator |
1997-06-06 - 2019-12-13
Făleşti, Musteaţa |
||
Administrator |
2005-11-03 - 2019-12-13
Căuşeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare şi Sfînt bd., 80, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-29 - 2019-06-06
Bălţi, str. Lazo S., 11 |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-29 - 2014-11-28
Călăraşi, str. Mitropolit Dosoftei, 113 |
||
Administrator |
2006-05-04 - 2019-12-18
Soroca, str. Mateevici A., 1, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
2000-08-04 - 2020-02-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Humuleşti, 13/4, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1992-04-09 - 2020-12-16
Edineţ, str. Plugarilor, 5 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2002-05-23
Teleneşti, Sărătenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
2012-08-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Basarab Matei, 5/4, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2004-06-10
Glodeni, Sturzovca |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-09 - 2022-03-29
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Repin Ilia, 6, ap.(of.) 3,4 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2011-03-09
Criuleni, Măgdăceşti |
||
Administrator |
1998-08-05 - 2020-07-10
mun. Chişinău, Sîngera, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 35 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2008-07-21
Basarabeasca, Sadaclia |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-21 - 2019-12-26
Rîşcani, Mihăileni |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-26 - 2020-05-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Dimo N., 5/2, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-02-20 - 2019-12-26
Donduşeni, str. Dzerjinski, 33 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-16 - 2019-12-23
Floreşti, str. Costin Miron, 32 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2013-03-19 - 2019-12-27
mun. Chişinău, Ciorescu, str. Moldova, 3, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
2008-06-17 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Domulgeni |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-06 - 2019-12-31
Floreşti, Ghindeşti |
||
Administrator |
2010-01-21 - 2020-01-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 16, ap.(of.) 41 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-07-27 - 2020-01-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 22, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
1997-08-22 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, Bursuc |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-29 - 2020-01-09
Ungheni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 28, ap.(of.) 64 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-22 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Brâncuşi C., 146, ap.(of.) 79 |
||
Administrator |
2015-02-27 - 2020-01-11
Basarabeasca, str. Verde, 35 |
||
Administrator |
2014-05-20 - 2020-05-14
Sîngerei, str. Voiniţchi Eugen, 12, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2008-12-15 - 2021-03-26
Hînceşti, Cărpineni, str. Independenţei, 87 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2013-02-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Dezghingea, str. Lazo S., 2/a |
||
Administrator |
2003-02-11 - 2020-01-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Iazului, 5, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-20 - 2020-02-28
Edineţ, Brînzeni |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-28 - 2020-03-02
Căuşeni, Ursoaia, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 19 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-12
Hînceşti, Dubovca |