Retail trade of meat and meat products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2013-03-28 - 2015-02-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Bălănescu, 46, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-11 - 2013-04-18
Anenii Noi, str. Chişinău, 68, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-28 - 2013-10-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bariera Sculeni, 2/1, ap.(of.) 46 |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-15 - 2013-08-15
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Ureche Gr., 10/A, ap.(of.) 72 |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-16 - 2014-12-22
Ialoveni, Dănceni |
||
Administrator |
2005-03-21 - 2021-12-31
Cimişlia, Gura Galbenei |
||
Administrator |
2013-01-11 - 2014-07-15
Făleşti, Mărăndeni |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-15 - 2014-08-14
Rîşcani, Corlăteni |
||
Administrator |
2013-09-10 - 2014-06-20
Rîşcani, str. Testemiţeanu N., 9 |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-20 - 2015-02-16
Făleşti, str. Stere C., 67 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2013-03-01 - 2014-09-25
Cahul, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 9/V |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-07 - 2015-06-04
Cahul, str. Tîrgul Vechi, 26 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2007-03-14 - 2020-11-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 13, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-16 - 2015-01-27
Leova, Tomai |
||
Administrator |
2013-10-10 - 2014-07-29
Cimişlia, str. Iorga Nicolae, 34 |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-13 - 2016-12-13
Cimişlia, str. Cehov, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2013-05-22 - 2013-09-25
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-10 - 2014-01-03
Orhei, str. Viteazul Mihai, 34 |
||
Administrator |
2013-08-23 - 2017-03-17
Drochia, Chetrosu |
||
Lichidator |
2013-02-28 - 2015-12-11
Ungheni, Gherman |
||
Administrator |
2013-04-25 - 2016-11-23
Călăraşi, Seliştea Nouă, str. Livezilor, 19 |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-05 - 2016-02-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Cazaclia, str. Puşkin A., 140 |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-06 - 2020-02-17
Bălţi, str. Caragiale I.L., 47 |
||
Administrator |
2014-09-16 - 2014-10-22
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 14, ap.(of.) 11 |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-06 - 2014-09-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Stamati C., 1, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-03 - 2015-12-18
Străşeni, Romăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2014-10-20 - 2015-06-08
mun. Chişinău, Coloniţa, str. Florilor, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2014-11-04 - 2017-03-02
Anenii Noi, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-15 - 2015-02-18
Sîngerei, str. Independenţei, 169, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-06 - 2015-07-28
Bălţi, str. Solnecinaia, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-19 - 1995-09-01
Bălţi, str. Heciului, 69 |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-28 - 2015-01-21
Cahul, str. Viteazul Mihai, 47, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-05 - 2016-12-23
Cimişlia, Porumbrei |
||
Administrator |
2014-08-06 - 2015-04-02
Hînceşti, Cărpineni, str. Davîdov Vadim, 20 |
||
Administrator |
2014-11-07 - 2015-08-05
Cimişlia, Marienfeld |