Retail trade of meat and meat products
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2008-06-09
Glodeni, str. Cocoreanu Vasile, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-01 - 2017-05-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mălina Mică, 20, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-14 - 2020-06-25
Bălţi, str. Decebal, 166, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-21
Sîngerei, Dobrogea Veche |
||
Administrator |
1998-11-24 - 2019-04-03
Ungheni, Floriţoaia Veche |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-03 - 2018-11-26
Orhei, Ghetlova |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-21 - 2008-12-25
Făleşti, str. Lăpuşneanu A., 31 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-04-29 - 2017-04-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Suceviţa, 47/A |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-18 - 2023-03-21
Briceni, Pererita |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-18
Sîngerei, Sîngereii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-27 - 2009-02-26
Cahul, Alexanderfeld |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-12
Cahul, str. Stroescu V., 41, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-15
Briceni, Mărcăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-22 - 2009-03-13
Cahul, Spicoasa |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-21
Cahul, str. Basarab Matei, 28, ap.(of.) 55 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2008-08-19 - 2023-12-22
mun. Chişinău, Bubuieci, str. Şcolii, 76/A |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-04 - 2012-06-04
Bălţi, str. Slobozia Nouă, 25 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-22
Cahul, Giurgiuleşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-19
Cahul, str. Stroescu V., 38, ap.(of.) 45 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-13
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Korceaghin Pavel, 18, ap.(of.) 59 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-08-04 - 2018-01-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Russo Alecu, 5/1, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-14 - 2008-06-23
Ocniţa, Mereşeuca |
||
Administrator |
1999-10-18 - 2020-01-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Neculce Ion, 5, ap.(of.) 63 |
||
Administrator |
1997-09-02 - 2009-08-03
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Lazo S., 24 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-21
Edineţ, str. Mendeleev D., 14 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-19
Briceni, str. Prieteniei, 64 |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-06
Briceni, Halahora de Sus |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-26
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Independenţei, 33, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-14 - 2011-10-04
Edineţ, str. Burebista, 15 |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-16
Ocniţa, Codreni |
||
Administrator |
1994-07-15 - 2008-10-15
Edineţ, str. Cikalov V., 16 |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-15 - 2018-12-03
Edineţ, str. Zadnipru P., 13, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-31
Orhei, Ciocîlteni |
||
Administrator |
1994-05-17 - 2008-09-17
Briceni, Lipcani, str. Libertăţii, 64 |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-22 - 2008-12-10
Briceni, str. Independenţei, 37/303 |