Retail trade of fresh potatoes, vegetables and fruits
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1997-06-24 - 2002-04-18
Edineţ, Gordineşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-10 - 2016-06-29
Edineţ, str. Basarabia, 33 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-21 - 2002-05-14
Edineţ, Parcova |
||
Administrator |
2002-11-14 - 2009-02-19
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 54 |
||
Administrator |
2007-03-27 - 2016-07-13
Edineţ, Trinca |
||
Administrator |
2001-12-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 63/3, ap.(of.) 70 |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-26 - 2023-01-18
Anenii Noi, Maximovca |
||
Administrator |
2002-11-27 - 2010-11-29
mun. Chişinău, Grătieşti, str. Tineretului, 21 |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 13/2 |
||
Administrator |
2001-11-16
Căuşeni, str. Costin Miron, 16 |
||
Administrator |
1998-09-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Paris, 38/2, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-09
Hînceşti, Mingir |
||
Administrator |
2014-01-14 - 2018-12-07
Cantemir, Ţiganca |
||
Administrator |
1999-03-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Tighina, 65, ap.(of.) 610 A |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-11 - 2000-03-30
Cahul, Doina |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-12 - 2000-08-28
Cantemir, Şamalia |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-09 - 2000-12-21
Cantemir, Cîrpeşti |
||
Administrator |
2002-12-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Mărăşeşti, 36 |
||
Administrator |
2002-12-13 - 2011-06-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 22/1, ap.(of.) 812 |
||
Administrator |
2002-12-31 - 2013-08-23
Hînceşti, Negrea |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-09 - 2002-08-06
Cantemir, Goteşti |
||
Administrator |
1997-05-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Văleni, 22 |
||
Administrator |
2009-11-26 - 2019-06-03
Cahul, str. Strada Veche, 135, ap.(of.) 53 |
||
Administrator |
2001-10-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 7 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1995-10-24 - 2010-07-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Moscova bd., 2, ap.(of.) 130 |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-05
Bălţi, str. Calea Ieşilor, 106 |
||
Administrator provizoriu Administrator |
2013-02-08 - 2023-10-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 404, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-22 - 2013-07-17
Hînceşti, Cărpineni |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Rareş Petru, 36, ap.(of.) 19 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1999-04-16 - 2018-01-05
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator Administrator |
1994-01-06 - 2012-03-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 4/1 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2013-01-18 - 2018-01-05
Teleneşti, Bogzeşti |
||
Administrator |
2002-06-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Ştefănucă Petre, 12, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-13 - 2016-05-25
Cimişlia, Mihailovca |
||
Administrator |
2010-06-09 - 2018-12-07
Briceni, str. Turghenev, 2, ap.(of.) 30 |