Retail trade of fresh potatoes, vegetables and fruits
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2011-09-22 - 2011-12-16
Teleneşti, Ordăşei |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-23
Rezina, Saharna Nouă |
||
Administrator |
2011-10-07
Şoldăneşti, Fuzăuca |
||
Administrator |
2011-12-09
Şoldăneşti, Curătura |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-31
Drochia, str. Călinescu George, 6 |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-31 - 2011-08-22
Drochia, Gribova |
||
Administrator |
2011-04-06 - 2012-07-12
Drochia, str. Testemiţeanu N., 57 |
||
Administrator |
2011-04-28 - 2012-04-13
Drochia, str. Stamati C., 29 |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-31 - 2011-06-17
Soroca, str. Studenţilor, 12, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2008-06-06 - 2019-04-01
Basarabeasca, Carabiber |
||
Administrator |
2011-12-08 - 2012-06-08
Soroca, str. Busuiocului str-la, 9 |
||
Administrator |
2007-09-10 - 2019-11-01
Sîngerei, str. Hîjdeu A., 46 |
||
Administrator Administrator |
2015-02-26
Leova, Borogani |
||
Administrator |
2012-10-23 - 2022-01-24
Rezina, Pereni |
||
Administrator |
2014-04-15
Criuleni, str. Tolstoi L., 17 |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-01 - 2019-04-01
Basarabeasca, Sadaclia, str. Frunze M. |
||
Administrator |
2011-01-03
Călăraşi, Sipoteni |
||
Administrator |
2013-12-10 - 2017-07-24
Ialoveni, Costeşti |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-24
Ungheni, str. Decebal, 85 |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-03 - 2011-05-04
Nisporeni, Boldureşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-12 - 2011-05-16
Nisporeni, str. Micle Veronica, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-10 - 2012-08-16
Cahul, str. Sfatul Ţării, 27 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2011-10-12 - 2019-11-01
Taraclia, str. Gorkii, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2011-10-07 - 2012-05-07
Călăraşi, Bahmut |
||
Administrator |
2011-10-19
Călăraşi, Seliştea Nouă |
||
Administrator |
2011-12-07
Ungheni, Cetireni |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-15
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Rîbhoznaia, 3, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2011-03-22 - 2012-06-04
UTA Găgăuzia, Cioc-Maidan, str. Colhoznaia, 36 |
||
Administrator |
2006-10-04 - 2021-01-15
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 35 |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Cotovschi, 39 |
||
Administrator |
2011-09-06
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Kirov, 31 |
||
Administrator |
2011-10-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Kalinin, 1, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2011-12-20
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Mavrodi str-la, 8 |
||
Administrator |
2005-06-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Florilor, 12/3, ap.(of.) 70 |
||
Administrator |
1997-05-07 - 2020-09-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Drăgan Maria, 4/2, ap.(of.) 57 |