Retail trade of fresh potatoes, vegetables and fruits
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1998-05-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 66/1, ap.(of.) 103 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-25
Cahul, str. Rumeanţev P., 23 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-26
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 31, ap.(of.) 61 |
||
Administrator |
2011-04-28 - 2017-05-03
Glodeni, Danu |
||
Administrator |
2008-05-28 - 2010-05-27
Cahul, str. Tineretului, 10/1, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-09
Cahul, str. Bujor, 37 |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-16 - 2017-05-24
Soroca, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 60, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2015-02-25
Taraclia, str. Voczalinaia, 74 |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-20 - 2017-05-11
Cahul, Zîrneşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-09-26 - 2008-11-05
Cahul, str. Viteazul Mihai, 7, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
2008-09-25 - 2012-04-04
Cahul, str. Cazacu Petru, 22, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-03
Cahul, str. Stejarilor, 20/A, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-14 - 2012-05-17
Cahul, str. Basarab Matei, 28, ap.(of.) 37 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-24 - 2010-10-01
Cahul, str. Dorobanţilor, 59 |
||
Administrator |
2008-11-05 - 2012-05-28
Cahul, str. Cazacu Petru, 22, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2012-12-03 - 2017-05-18
Ştefan Vodă, Purcari, str. Negruzzi C., 17 |
||
Administrator |
2008-12-09
Cantemir, Goteşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-12-08 - 2012-04-04
Cahul, str. Gura Frumoasei, 12, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1999-10-12 - 2009-01-23
Taraclia, str. Dzerjinski, 5, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2000-05-11 - 2008-01-16
Ocniţa, Grinăuţi-Raia |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-24
Edineţ, Brătuşeni |
||
Administrator |
2005-12-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Trandafirilor, 33/3, ap.(of.) 71 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2014-08-04 - 2018-01-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Russo Alecu, 5/1, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-23
Briceni, Coteala |
||
Administrator |
1997-09-02 - 2009-08-03
Ocniţa, Otaci, str. Lazo S., 24 |
||
Administrator |
2000-01-06 - 2020-01-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Coca E., 17, ap.(of.) 42A |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-20
Donduşeni, Rediul Mare |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-18 - 2009-04-24
Donduşeni, Tîrnova |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-20 - 2009-07-17
Edineţ, str. Costin Miron, 32 |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-06
Briceni, Halahora de Sus |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-02 - 2010-07-15
Briceni, Medveja |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-14 - 2011-10-04
Edineţ, str. Burebista, 15 |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-17
mun. Chişinău, Bubuieci, str. 27 August, 103/A |
||
Administrator |
2008-05-12
Edineţ, Alexăndreni |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-21 - 2009-02-25
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi |