Retail trade of fresh potatoes, vegetables and fruits
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1998-01-19 - 2016-05-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Korolenko, 5/3 |
||
Administrator |
1997-06-02 - 2015-03-09
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Râşcanu Dumitru, 37, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Administrator |
2004-04-22 - 2016-11-25
Rîşcani, str. Izvoarelor, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-12 - 2013-07-08
Edineţ, Rotunda |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2015-01-22
Cahul, str. Kogălniceanu Mihail, 107 |
||
Administrator |
2004-10-28 - 2014-08-01
Edineţ, str. Şoseaua Bucovina, 19/8, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-19 - 2013-03-11
Ungheni, str. Unirii, 3/A, ap.(of.) 31 |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-20 - 2013-04-04
Ungheni, Unţeşti |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-07 - 2015-07-01
Teleneşti, Mîndreşti |
||
Administrator |
2004-06-08 - 2014-09-30
Orhei, str. Cupcea V., 3, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
2003-06-10 - 2020-11-20
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Bernardazzi Alexandru, 41, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
2004-08-19
Ungheni, str. Creangă Ion, 17, ap.(of.) 140 |
||
Administrator |
2004-10-20 - 2016-12-29
Nisporeni, str. Industrială, 38 |
||
Administrator |
2000-12-14 - 2017-04-05
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 146 |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-26 - 2016-01-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Beda Şt., 25 |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-25 - 2015-05-29
Cahul, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 46, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
2005-06-16 - 2015-04-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Voluntarilor, 15 |
||
Administrator |
2004-08-18 - 2020-11-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădina Botanică, 9 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2013-04-15 - 2019-09-10
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 15/1, ap.(of.) 153 |
||
Administrator |
2000-08-21
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Vieru Igor, 12, ap.(of.) 33 |
||
Administrator |
2005-11-11 - 2015-07-02
Glodeni, Viişoara |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-13 - 2013-02-08
Bălţi, str. Sadoveanu M., 2/64 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-13 - 2013-02-14
Edineţ, Brînzeni |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-28 - 2014-07-28
Rîşcani, Recea |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-26 - 2017-04-04
Briceni, Colicăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2005-03-22 - 2015-06-09
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator |
2005-04-06 - 2020-02-13
Bălţi, str. Feroviarilor, 43 |
||
Administrator |
2005-06-08 - 2016-07-26
Căuşeni, Tănătari |
||
Administrator |
1997-06-10 - 2014-03-26
Căuşeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 7, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-03 - 2020-11-19
Anenii Noi, Maximovca |
||
Administrator |
2005-05-25 - 2016-02-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Şevcenko T., 77 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-13
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Tretiacova, 110 |
||
Administrator |
2006-06-01 - 2015-10-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Salcîmilor, 24/3, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator |
1998-09-28 - 2020-02-13
Bălţi, str. Sovetscaia, 115 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2006-03-14 - 2018-12-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alba-Iulia, 75/G |