Other types of retail trade in non-specialized stores
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1999-04-26 - 2021-05-17
Taraclia, Valea Perjei, str. Lenin, 40 |
||
Administrator |
1996-11-11
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 23 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2007-10-03 - 2022-05-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Traian bd., 16, ap.(of.) 72 |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-02
Floreşti, str. Viteazul Mihai, 8, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-17 - 2024-05-08
Floreşti, Japca |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-17 - 2024-05-07
Floreşti, Năpadova |
||
Administrator |
2010-01-19 - 2024-05-08
Floreşti, str. Bucov E., 46 |
||
Administrator |
1999-12-03 - 2021-05-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Tolstoi L., 23 |
||
Administrator |
1998-11-23
Drochia, str. Plămădeală A., 21 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-19
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Gribov Nicolae, 6/2, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2010-04-14 - 2021-05-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Şciusev A., 107, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2010-11-25 - 2022-05-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. 31 August 1989, 58, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
2003-10-10 - 2021-05-25
Orhei, Mana |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-13 - 2021-05-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Etulia, str. Mira, 3 |
||
Administrator |
2007-05-10 - 2021-05-25
Edineţ, Volodeni |
||
Administrator |
2010-01-18 - 2021-05-25
Edineţ, Bădragii Noi |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-21 - 2021-05-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Mareşalului Malinovski str-la, 23 |
||
Administrator |
2013-11-15 - 2023-05-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Sarmizegetusa, 47/A, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-13 - 2021-05-26
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Luceafărul, 3/A |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-07 - 2021-05-26
Briceni, Hlina |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-10 - 2021-05-27
Floreşti, Domulgeni |
||
Administrator |
2010-01-28 - 2021-05-27
Donduşeni, Briceni |
||
Administrator |
2006-11-09 - 2022-05-06
Donduşeni, Baraboi |
||
Administrator |
2010-11-16 - 2021-05-26
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Tihii str-la, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-19 - 2021-05-26
Edineţ, Gordineşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-17 - 2021-05-26
Briceni, Grimăncăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-02 - 2021-05-31
Ocniţa, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 4, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2010-08-12 - 2021-06-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Arborilor, 17/1 |
||
Administrator |
2001-04-06 - 2021-06-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Milescu-Spătarul Nicolae, 13/1, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2010-11-23 - 2021-06-02
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 42 |
||
Administrator |
2008-04-23 - 2024-08-13
Basarabeasca, str. Tolstoi L., 52 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2012-01-18 - 2021-06-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 6/V |
||
Administrator |
1998-03-20 - 2004-07-01
Hînceşti, Lăpuşna |
||
Administrator |
2010-10-29 - 2022-05-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Calea Basarabiei, 18 |
||
Administrator |
2014-03-28 - 2021-06-07
Edineţ, str. Baltă Trifan, 152 |