Other types of retail trade in non-specialized stores
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1993-07-09 - 2014-10-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Creangă Ion, 55, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2008-03-27 - 2014-09-24
Edineţ, str. Independenţei, 15, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2009-10-08 - 2014-09-23
Briceni, Colicăuţi |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-03 - 2014-07-17
Basarabeasca, str. Krupskaia, 69 |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-17 - 2014-10-02
Hînceşti, Logăneşti |
||
Administrator |
2009-04-02 - 2014-09-02
Soroca, Nimereuca |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2010-02-25 - 2014-10-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Basarab Matei, 5/1, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2010-03-24 - 2014-06-23
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Mateevici A., 11, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2012-07-24 - 2014-06-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Doina şi Ion Aldea-Teodorovici, 16/2, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
2013-07-10 - 2014-06-19
Edineţ, Oneşti |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-10 - 2014-08-01
Edineţ, Zăbriceni |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-13 - 2014-08-01
Donduşeni, str. Cernov Ion, 19 |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-09 - 2014-08-06
Donduşeni, str. Lazo S., 17 |
||
Administrator |
1999-07-23 - 2014-07-30
Hînceşti, Buţeni |
||
Administrator |
2000-05-24
Rîşcani, Recea |
||
Administrator |
2002-05-16 - 2011-03-10
Orhei, str. Dorobanţi, 140 |
||
Administrator |
2000-07-07 - 2014-11-19
Soroca, str. Viilor, 6, ap.(of.) 42 |
||
Întreprinzător Individual CIOBANU DANIELA Lichidator Administrator |
2001-05-17 - 2014-11-27
Floreşti, str. Gării, 58 |
||
Lichidator |
2002-09-24 - 2014-11-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Cantemir D. piaţa, 1 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2008-02-25 - 2014-11-27
Edineţ, Brătuşeni, str. Fadeev, 15 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2009-07-28 - 2014-12-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 55, ap.(of.) 34 |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-05 - 2014-10-30
Donduşeni, str. Sîrbu Elena, 11/1, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2010-11-18 - 2014-11-20
Edineţ, Terebna |
||
Lichidator |
2011-03-16 - 2014-11-05
Criuleni, Măgdăceşti, str. Creangă Ion, 25 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1993-01-29 - 2015-03-05
Edineţ, Cupcini, str. 8 Martie, 21 |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-09 - 2015-02-09
Hînceşti, Sofia |
||
Administrator |
2004-02-28
Orhei, str. Unirii, 57 K |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-28 - 2015-01-27
Străşeni, str. Lupu Vasile, 15 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1992-04-20 - 2014-12-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Cişmichioi |
||
Administrator |
2006-08-02 - 2015-01-05
Şoldăneşti, Poiana |
||
Lichidator |
2007-07-05 - 2015-01-30
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 26/1, ap.(of.) A |
||
Administrator |
1993-09-20 - 2014-12-17
Donduşeni, str. Enghels F., 5 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-20 - 2015-01-29
Leova, Cupcui |
||
Administrator |
2000-06-16 - 2019-11-28
Hînceşti, str. Cogîlnic, 75 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2012-03-29 - 2015-03-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Doina şi Ion Aldea-Teodorovici, 14/1, ap.(of.) 6 |