Other types of retail trade in non-specialized stores
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1994-07-07 - 2007-09-05
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Tretiacova, 39 |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-24
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Puşkin A., 36/8 |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-03
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Voluntarilor, 17 |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-17 - 2010-08-13
Cimişlia, str. Eminescu Mihai, 1 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2003-03-21 - 2012-07-30
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator |
2007-10-08 - 2012-07-19
Cahul, str. Negruzzi C., 131, ap.(of.) 22 |
||
Administrator |
2007-11-05 - 2012-07-24
Soroca, Holoşniţa |
||
Administrator |
2012-02-16
Leova, Cupcui |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-04 - 2020-01-13
Cahul, Văleni |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1994-02-23 - 2012-10-22
Soroca, str. Minsk, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-07 - 2012-10-23
Soroca, str. Independenţei, 34, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-22 - 2012-12-18
Soroca, str. Romaniţei, 7 |
||
Administrator |
2008-02-21 - 2012-10-30
Floreşti, str. 31 August, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-18 - 2012-12-21
Ocniţa, Lipnic |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1993-02-19 - 2012-10-25
Soroca, str. Popovici Anatol, 4, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-15 - 2012-12-07
Soroca, str. Limba Română, 18, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-08 - 2012-12-26
Drochia |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-06 - 2013-03-18
UTA Găgăuzia, Dezghingea, str. Pobedî, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2007-06-29 - 2013-03-22
Cahul, str. Şolohov M., 34, ap.(of.) 65 |
||
Administrator |
2012-07-26 - 2013-03-21
Rezina, Ţipova |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-14 - 2013-04-01
Căuşeni, Hagimus |
||
Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator Administrator Lichidator Lichidator |
1993-01-28 - 2013-04-01
Cahul, str. Păcii, 12, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Lichidator Lichidator Administrator Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator Lichidator |
1998-04-22 - 2013-04-03
Cahul, str. Mateevici A., 92 |
||
Administrator |
2011-06-08 - 2013-05-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Ismail, 94/1, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-14 - 2013-05-16
Donduşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 23/1, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
2005-04-25
Leova, str. Cîmpiilor, 45 |
||
Administrator |
2001-04-09 - 2013-08-30
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Suvorov A., 71 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2008-06-10 - 2013-07-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Gagarin Iuri bd., 3, ap.(of.) 83 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2007-10-16 - 2023-12-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Inculeţ Ion, 105/3, ap.(of.) 25 |
||
Administrator |
2012-08-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Valea Trandafirilor, 6/1, ap.(of.) 233 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-29 - 2013-08-05
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 17/9, ap.(of.) 30 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-10-09 - 2013-07-19
Drochia, str. Dubinovschi Lazăr, 1B |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1995-07-31 - 2013-07-24
Drochia, str. Creangă Ion, 13 |
||
Administrator fiduciar Administrator |
1995-10-04 - 2013-10-07
Bălţi, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 4 |
||
Administrator |
2002-04-25 - 2013-11-05
Drochia, Chetrosu |