Retail trade in non-specialized stores
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1997-09-30 - 2019-03-05
Bălţi, str. Unirii piaţa, 27 |
||
1998-06-29 - 2010-09-28
Căuşeni, str. Belinski V., 23 |
|||
2000-01-18 - 2010-09-30
Soroca, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni Gavril, 12/3 |
|||
2001-10-15 - 2010-09-30
Soroca, str. Calea Bălţului, 71 |
|||
1995-07-11 - 2010-09-30
Soroca, str. Renaşterii, 10 |
|||
1995-03-01 - 2010-09-30
Soroca, str. Lupu Vasile, 30 |
|||
Administrator |
1995-06-28 - 2019-03-07
Ştefan Vodă, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-12 - 2019-03-05
Nisporeni, Mileşti |
||
Administrator |
1998-07-10 - 2019-08-13
Edineţ, Brătuşeni |
||
Administrator |
2001-01-22 - 2017-04-20
Călăraşi, Bahmut |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-12 - 2019-09-24
Drochia, str. Independenţei, 81, ap.(of.) 66 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-11 - 2019-09-24
Drochia, str. 31 August, 12, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-26 - 2019-09-24
Drochia, Nicoreni |
||
2001-02-05 - 2010-10-30
Soroca, str. Colinelor, 11 |
|||
Administrator |
1996-10-03 - 2017-04-19
Călăraşi, Vălcineţ |
||
Administrator |
1994-09-29 - 2019-03-13
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 15/2, ap.(of.) 71 |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-09 - 2017-04-18
Călăraşi, Căbăieşti |
||
Administrator |
1992-05-27 - 2017-09-15
Drochia, str. Plămădeală A., 64 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-07 - 2017-09-14
Drochia, str. Sfatul Ţării, 25, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-17 - 2017-09-13
Drochia, str. Mitropolit Varlaam, 11, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-09 - 2018-04-05
Ungheni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 27 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-13 - 2018-04-05
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 7, ap.(of.) 15 |
||
Administrator |
2003-11-05 - 2017-04-03
Drochia, Sofia |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-02 - 2017-03-23
Nisporeni, Bălăureşti |
||
Administrator |
1992-06-15 - 2023-10-19
Călăraşi, str. Tineretului, 18 |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-22
Nisporeni, str. Decebal, 36 |
||
Administrator |
2003-04-30 - 2017-03-06
Căuşeni, Plop-Ştiubei |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-04 - 2017-03-06
Căuşeni, Chircăieştii Noi |
||
Administrator |
2002-01-21
Ungheni, Pîrliţa |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-12 - 2016-07-05
Cimişlia, Mereni |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-24 - 2016-07-08
Cantemir, Sadîc |
||
Administrator |
1999-02-22 - 2016-06-23
Anenii Noi, Bulboaca |
||
Administrator |
2003-07-15 - 2019-03-14
Soroca, str. Gutuilor, 2 |
||
Administrator |
1992-08-04
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. 31 August 1989, 63 |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-06 - 2019-03-18
Ştefan Vodă, Ermoclia |