Wholesale trade of wood materials, building materials and sanitary equipment
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2009-02-03
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 34, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2013-04-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Grădina Botanică, 14/3, ap.(of.) 307 |
||
Administrator |
2011-05-03 - 2023-10-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Cuza-Vodă bd., 1/1, ap.(of.) 66 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2003-02-13 - 2021-07-23
Hînceşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 89 |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-11
Hînceşti, str. Iachir I., 14 |
||
Administrator |
2007-07-17 - 2020-01-24
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Testemiţeanu N., 24, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2006-02-23 - 2021-08-05
Orhei, str. Drumul Taberei, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2009-06-25
Leova, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 30 |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-20 - 2017-06-27
Orhei, str. Răzeşilor, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-16
Hînceşti, str. 31 August, 6/A |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-15 - 2011-02-14
Şoldăneşti, str. Păcii, 31, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-02
Teleneşti, Ratuş |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-27
Teleneşti, Tîrşiţei |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-02
Orhei, str. Lazo S., 4/B, ap.(of.) 9 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-10
Şoldăneşti, str. Eminescu Mihai, 68 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-18
Orhei, Step-Soci |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-19 - 2009-02-12
Rezina, str. Voluntarilor, 7, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-21
Orhei, Peresecina |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-12
Orhei, Vatici |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-18 - 2009-03-02
Rezina, Cinişeuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-25
Şoldăneşti, str. Trandafirilor, 39 |
||
Administrator |
2011-08-01 - 2017-06-27
Orhei, str. Negruzzi C., 91 |
||
Administrator |
2010-04-28
Rezina, Gordineşti |
||
Administrator |
2014-02-26 - 2017-06-27
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 34 |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-22
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 133/E |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-25
Rezina, str. 27 August, 58 |
||
Administrator |
2009-03-30
Teleneşti, Sărătenii Vechi |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-25 - 2012-03-23
Orhei, Cişmea |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1993-05-10 - 2010-08-16
Şoldăneşti, str. Glavan Boris, 24 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1993-03-01 - 2011-03-04
Şoldăneşti, str. Păcii, 31, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-08 - 2012-04-26
Sîngerei, Chişcăreni |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-08
Orhei, str. Meşteşugarilor, 42 |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-13
Teleneşti, Ţînţăreni |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-20 - 2010-03-12
Orhei, str. Nouă, 14 |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-03 - 2017-06-27
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 23, ap.(of.) 3 |