Wholesale trade in cereals, seeds and animal feed
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
2006-12-12 - 2017-04-20
Călăraşi, Seliştea Nouă |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-09 - 2016-11-23
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Fedico, 52, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-02 - 2013-02-21
Anenii Noi, Socoleni, str. Păcii, 11 |
||
Administrator |
2007-04-05 - 2015-02-02
Anenii Noi, Puhăceni |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1999-10-18 - 2014-06-06
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Zelinski N., 38/4, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
1997-08-15 - 2011-12-07
Soroca, Redi-Cereşnovăţ |
|||
Administrator |
2007-07-20 - 2015-01-26
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 71/7, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
1998-09-28 - 2011-10-04
Soroca |
|||
Administrator |
1993-12-03 - 2013-02-25
Sîngerei, str. Independenţei, 155 |
||
1997-03-27 - 2010-04-07
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Lenin, 103 |
|||
Administrator |
2014-04-23
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 164, ap.(of.) 405 |
||
Administrator |
2007-01-22 - 2015-07-01
Teleneşti, Mîndreşti |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-02 - 2015-07-28
Orhei, Isacova |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-16 - 2017-04-25
Orhei, str. Iachir I., 55, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
2007-12-29 - 2016-03-09
Şoldăneşti, Cobîlea |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-15 - 2016-09-08
Orhei, Pelivan |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-06 - 2015-07-07
UTA Găgăuzia, Cazaclia, str. Voroşilov str-la, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-10 - 2013-07-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Nouă, 15, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
2000-01-24 - 2015-07-16
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Alexandrescu Grigore, 7, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
2001-03-30 - 2010-04-29
mun. Chişinău, Vadul lui Vodă, str. Izvoarelor, 2 |
|||
1995-07-10 - 2010-05-06
Cahul, Slobozia Mare, str. Fântânarilor, 2 |
|||
2005-05-16 - 2010-05-07
Teleneşti, Brînzenii Noi |
|||
Administrator |
2008-10-28 - 2013-09-19
Bălţi, str. Vladimirescu Tudor, 7, ap.(of.) 31 |
||
Administrator |
2008-01-26 - 2013-02-26
Briceni, str. Turghenev, 5 |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-06 - 2015-08-04
Orhei, Isacova |
||
Administrator |
2008-08-08 - 2015-08-26
Orhei, Isacova |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-10 - 2017-01-03
Şoldăneşti, Rogojeni |
||
Administrator |
2009-01-16 - 2015-08-26
Orhei, str. Codru, 11 |
||
Administrator |
2008-07-29 - 2015-02-18
Floreşti, Băhrineşti |
||
Administrator |
2008-10-01 - 2016-06-08
Soroca, Băxani |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-29 - 2013-10-02
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. Plotnikov str-la, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2009-02-25 - 2013-09-30
Criuleni, Slobozia-Duşca, str. Lenin, 16 |
||
Administrator |
2009-05-29 - 2015-10-15
Bălţi, str. Kiev, 4, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-09 - 2015-03-20
Glodeni, Sturzovca |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-04 - 2013-09-02
Bălţi, str. 1 Mai, 52 |