Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-02-09 - 2020-01-13
Leova, Tomai |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-08 - 2020-01-13
Leova, str. Iorga Nicolae, 10 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1997-07-02 - 2021-09-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Russo Alecu, 24C, ap.(of.) M1 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2012-02-17 - 2021-07-20
Cahul, Burlăceni |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-16 - 2020-12-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Sf.Maria, 10 |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-02 - 2020-01-13
Rezina, Ţareuca |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-06 - 2020-05-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Asachi Gh., 62, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-29 - 2020-05-14
Sîngerei, Biruinţa, str. Livezilor, 47 |
||
Administrator |
2008-03-26 - 2020-01-13
Soroca, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 28, ap.(of.) 23 |
||
Administrator |
2013-03-28 - 2020-01-13
Drochia, Cotova |
||
Administrator |
2002-11-28 - 2020-01-10
Ungheni, str. 31 August, 2 |
||
Administrator |
2002-12-27 - 2020-01-11
Nisporeni, Zberoaia |
||
Administrator |
2009-07-30 - 2020-01-11
Ungheni, str. Ungureanu Oleg, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-29 - 2020-01-10
Ungheni, Romanovca |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-03 - 2020-01-10
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 5, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-26 - 2020-01-14
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Gavriliuca, 142 |
||
Administrator |
1994-03-02 - 2020-01-14
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Dutlova, 33 |
||
Administrator |
1996-08-19 - 2020-02-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Avdarma |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-08
Anenii Noi, Varniţa, str. Kalinin, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1999-01-11 - 2020-01-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Mesager, 5/3, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-17
Drochia, str. Ghica-Vodă, 42 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-18 - 2020-01-14
Floreşti, Cuhureştii de Sus |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-05 - 2020-01-14
Floreşti, str. Mateevici A., 29, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-15 - 2020-01-13
Leova, str. Cibotari Maria, 12 |
||
Administrator |
2002-10-15 - 2020-01-10
Ungheni, Sineşti |
||
Administrator |
1992-08-11 - 2020-01-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bănulescu-Bodoni Gavril, 45 |
||
Administrator |
2004-05-05 - 2020-01-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 8, ap.(of.) 151 |
||
Administrator |
2012-11-29 - 2020-01-15
Soroca, str. Crizantemelor, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-28
Soroca, str. Viilor, 11 |
||
Administrator |
2005-07-04
mun. Chişinău, Stăuceni, str. Mioriţa, 37 |
||
Administrator |
2003-02-17 - 2020-01-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 40/3, ap.(of.) 34 |
||
Administrator |
2002-10-17 - 2020-01-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Busuioceşti, 25, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
1992-07-24 - 2020-01-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 176, ap.(of.) 66 |
||
Administrator |
1999-12-02 - 2020-02-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mălăieşti, 6 |
||
Administrator |
1993-07-16 - 2020-02-28
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 38, ap.(of.) 202 |