Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1999-01-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Academiei, 15/1 |
||
Administrator |
2003-03-21 - 2020-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 84/5, ap.(of.) 65 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-23 - 2020-05-13
Făleşti, Răuţel |
||
Administrator |
2003-05-13 - 2020-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Magda Isanos, 15, ap.(of.) 51 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
2006-11-21 - 2020-01-02
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dacia bd., 40/1, ap.(of.) 28 |
||
Administrator |
1998-12-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Puşkin A., 22, ap.(of.) 219 |
||
Administrator |
2002-06-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Albişoara, 64/2 |
||
Administrator |
2001-08-23 - 2020-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Eminescu Mihai, 40, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1998-01-27 - 2020-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Munceşti şos., 271, ap.(of.) 313A |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-07 - 2015-11-17
Leova, Iargara, str. Negruzzi C., 41 |
||
Administrator |
1995-09-19 - 2015-11-13
Hînceşti, str. Chişinăului, 12, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-22 - 2015-11-20
Bălţi, str. Bucovinei, 31, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2011-01-10 - 2023-08-10
Bălţi, str. Malinovski Rodion, 22 |
||
Administrator |
1997-07-16 - 2020-02-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Millo Matei, 9/3 A |
||
Administrator |
2011-02-16 - 2020-01-02
Şoldăneşti, str. Regiei, 84 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2011-05-11
Rezina, Boşerniţa |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-19 - 2020-01-02
Orhei, str. Iachir, 2, ap.(of.) 6 |
||
Administrator |
2009-12-23
UTA Găgăuzia, Vulcăneşti, str. 25 let Moldavii, 24 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-02 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, str. Ureche Gr., 6/A, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-31 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, Pîrliţa |
||
Administrator |
1994-06-22 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, Bolţun |
||
Administrator |
1996-10-07 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-10 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 73 |
||
Administrator |
2000-05-18 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 11, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-24 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, str. Creangă Ion, 17, ap.(of.) 139 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-22 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, Buzduganii de Jos |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-29 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 31 |
||
Administrator |
1997-01-27
Orhei, str. Lupu Vasile, 5, ap.(of.) 5 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-28 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, Boldureşti |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-17 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, str. Ureche Gr., 2, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-10 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, Vărzăreşti |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-14 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, str. Chişinăului, 2/G, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1996-04-01 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, Şendreni |
||
Administrator |
1997-09-16 - 2020-01-02
Ungheni, str. Creangă Ion, 23, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-10 - 2020-01-02
Nisporeni, str. Tineretului, 48 |