Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1995-01-04 - 2019-09-06
Cantemir, str. Trandafirilor, 6, ap.(of.) 49 |
||
Administrator |
2011-04-11
Bălţi, str. Darwin Charles, 5 |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-31 - 2019-03-07
Bălţi, str. Kolesov Ivan, 3, ap.(of.) 60 |
||
Administrator |
1993-01-05 - 2019-03-07
Bălţi, str. Victoriei, 92, ap.(of.) 8 |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-02 - 2019-03-07
Bălţi, str. Basarab Matei, 22 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-08 - 2019-03-07
Bălţi, str. Independenţei, 36, ap.(of.) 10 |
||
Administrator |
1992-12-30 - 2019-03-07
Bălţi, str. Bulgară, 96, ap.(of.) 36 |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-01 - 2019-03-07
Bălţi, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 31, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-17 - 2019-03-07
Edineţ, str. Bucovinei, 25, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-28
Orhei, str. Haşdeu Bogdan Petriceicu, 2A |
||
Administrator |
2013-02-25 - 2019-03-05
Basarabeasca, str. Şcolinaia, 67 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-22 - 2019-03-07
Bălţi, Elizaveta, str. 31 August, 1 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-28 - 2019-08-05
Edineţ, Alexăndreni |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-17 - 2019-05-23
Briceni, str. Fierarilor, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-09 - 2019-06-27
Briceni, Drepcăuţi |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-15 - 2019-05-22
Briceni, str. Uzinelor, 16, ap.(of.) 27 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
2007-06-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Dorobanţi, 15 |
||
Administrator |
1996-06-10 - 2024-05-27
Donduşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 26, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-15 - 2016-06-23
Bălţi, str. Puiu Visarion, 28/A, ap.(of.) 46 |
||
Administrator |
2010-11-08
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Sadoveanu M., 26/3, ap.(of.) 173 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-13 - 2016-06-22
Edineţ, Trinca |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1997-11-18
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Calea Ieşilor, 30 |
||
1994-01-18 - 2010-10-22
Teleneşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 8, ap.(of.) 27 |
|||
Administrator |
2001-03-06 - 2019-03-06
Glodeni, Hîjdieni |
||
Administrator |
2001-01-22 - 2017-04-20
Călăraşi, Bahmut |
||
Administrator |
1998-06-08 - 2017-04-20
Ialoveni, Mileştii Mici |
||
1997-02-14 - 2010-10-19
Rezina, Ciorna, str. Gagarin Iu., 39 |
|||
Administrator |
1999-08-21 - 2019-03-11
Orhei, str. Orheiul Vechi, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-08
Nisporeni, Vînători |
||
1994-09-08 - 2010-10-21
Donduşeni, str. Creangă Ion, 14, ap.(of.) 1 |
|||
Administrator Lichidator |
2002-05-02 - 2019-03-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Bariera Sculeni, 38 |
||
1997-02-19 - 2010-10-27
mun. Chişinău, Codru, str. Cobzarilor, 22/1 |
|||
1995-06-23 - 2010-10-25
Căuşeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 3, ap.(of.) 18 |
|||
2001-04-05 - 2010-10-25
mun. Chişinău, sec. Botanica, str. Decebal bd., 19, ap.(of.) 61 |
|||
Lichidator Administrator |
2004-04-17 - 2019-03-11
Orhei, Pelivan |