Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1998-08-28 - 2007-10-30
Bălţi, str. Rahmaninov Serghei, 3 |
||
Administrator |
2000-01-12 - 2020-02-13
Făleşti, str. Decebal, 12 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-23 - 2019-09-11
Rîşcani, str. Independenţei, 16/A, ap.(of.) 24 |
||
Administrator |
1998-12-04
Bălţi, str. Independenţei, 10, ap.(of.) 37 |
||
Administrator |
1996-09-16 - 2019-09-11
Făleşti, str. Decebal, 25 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-30 - 2019-09-12
Făleşti, str. 31 August, 106 |
||
Administrator |
2004-01-16
Taraclia, str. Cara Veaceslav, 14 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-07 - 2016-03-29
Cahul, str. Frunze M., 55, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
2004-02-09 - 2014-08-15
Cahul, Baurci-Moldoveni |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-28
Cahul, str. Frunze M., 23, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-09 - 2019-09-10
Rîşcani, str. Prieteniei, 24 |
||
Administrator |
2004-02-10
Cahul, Colibaşi |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-04
Cahul, Zîrneşti |
||
Administrator |
1993-11-03 - 2015-05-19
Cahul, str. Negruzzi Constantin bd., 139, ap.(of.) 18 |
||
Administrator |
2009-09-07 - 2021-03-11
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Vieru Grigore bd., 22/10, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
2002-08-13
Cahul, str. Ioan Vodă cel Cumplit, 54 |
||
Administrator |
2000-06-27 - 2019-01-03
Cantemir, Şamalia |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-23
mun. Chişinău, sec. Buiucani, str. Drumul Crucii, 111 |
||
1998-02-16 - 2004-07-14
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Ginta Latină, 17/1, ap.(of.) 71 |
|||
Administrator |
1995-12-12
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Petricani, 56 |
||
Administrator Administrator provizoriu |
2012-09-19 - 2020-12-01
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Frumoasa, 64 |
||
Administrator |
2002-10-17 - 2020-02-18
Ungheni, str. Burebista, 41, ap.(of.) 40 |
||
Administrator |
1993-10-26 - 2020-02-18
Ungheni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 163, ap.(of.) 138 |
||
Administrator |
2007-02-27
mun. Chişinău, sec. Ciocana, str. Mircea cel Bătrân bd., 12, ap.(of.) 134 |
||
Administrator |
2012-03-01
mun. Chişinău, Durleşti, str. Timişoara, 4/1 |
||
Administrator |
2001-01-22 - 2020-02-18
Floreşti, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 42 |
||
Lichidator Administrator |
1996-04-24 - 2019-02-15
mun. Chişinău, sec. Centru, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 19, ap.(of.) 51 |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-14 - 2019-02-15
Sîngerei, str. Eminescu Mihai, 7 |
||
Administrator |
2008-06-11
Soroca, Schineni |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-31 - 2019-02-15
Bălţi, str. Bucovinei, 170, ap.(of.) 69 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-23 - 2019-09-17
Cahul, str. Plămădeală A., 2 |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-26 - 2017-07-13
Nisporeni, Vărzăreşti |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-06 - 2017-07-13
Nisporeni, Brătuleni |
||
Administrator |
2002-02-19 - 2017-07-13
Nisporeni, Selişte |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-29 - 2017-07-13
Nisporeni, Cioreşti |