Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1999-09-15 - 2017-02-20
Ungheni, str. Musatov Fiodor, 34, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1998-04-01 - 2017-02-20
Ungheni, str. Haiducilor, 12 |
||
Administrator |
1994-11-23 - 2017-02-20
Ungheni, str. Creangă Ion, 7, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1997-10-09 - 2017-02-21
Ungheni, str. Caragiale I.L., 16 |
||
Administrator |
1998-10-26 - 2017-02-21
Ungheni, str. Arcaşii lui Ştefan, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1998-11-02 - 2017-02-21
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 4, ap.(of.) 32 |
||
Administrator |
1998-10-27 - 2017-02-21
Ungheni, str. Naţională, 14 |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-12 - 2017-02-21
Ungheni, str. Salcîmilor, 34 |
||
Administrator |
1997-11-03 - 2017-02-22
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 17/37 |
||
Administrator |
1993-06-24 - 2017-02-22
Ungheni, str. Burebista, 31, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-06 - 2017-02-23
Ungheni, str. Iaşi, 7 |
||
Administrator |
1998-02-11 - 2017-02-24
Ungheni, str. Crestiuc Ghenadie, 5, ap.(of.) 35 |
||
Administrator |
1997-03-17 - 2017-02-24
Ungheni, str. Alexandru cel Bun, 73 |
||
Administrator Lichidator |
1992-11-03 - 2017-01-19
Ungheni, Corneşti, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 69 |
||
Administrator |
1992-11-30 - 2017-03-06
Ungheni, str. Găureni, 16 |
||
Administrator |
1997-09-16 - 2017-03-06
Ungheni, Buşila |
||
Administrator |
2006-03-28 - 2021-03-17
mun. Chişinău, sec. Rîşcani, str. Madan Gheorghe, 46/6, ap.(of.) 17 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-15 - 2017-03-15
Nisporeni, str. Fîntînilor, 4 |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-24 - 2017-03-17
Nisporeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 8 |
||
Administrator |
1994-02-03 - 2017-03-20
Nisporeni, str. Micle Veronica, 7, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1993-01-15 - 2017-03-20
Nisporeni, str. Suveranităţii, 52 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-20 - 2017-03-20
Nisporeni, str. Suveranităţii, 15, ap.(of.) 21 |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-26 - 2016-12-29
Nisporeni, str. Viilor, 28 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-25 - 2016-04-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Congaz, str. Miciurin, 47 |
||
Administrator |
1992-07-08 - 2016-07-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Soltîs Ion, 36 |
||
Administrator |
1995-06-20 - 2016-10-18
UTA Găgăuzia, Dezghingea, str. Koşevoi Oleg, 33 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-25 - 2016-08-16
UTA Găgăuzia, Baurci, str. Suvorov A., 70 |
||
Administrator |
1994-07-05 - 2016-08-25
UTA Găgăuzia, Comrat, str. Matrosov, 3A, ap.(of.) 4 |
||
Administrator |
1995-03-07 - 2019-01-04
Edineţ, Trinca |
||
Administrator |
1995-12-15 - 2016-09-28
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Jukovski, 117 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-06 - 2016-09-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Lenin, 23/1, ap.(of.) 60 |
||
Administrator |
1996-03-15 - 2016-09-29
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Turghenev, 33 |
||
Administrator |
1995-10-27 - 2016-10-03
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Jubiliară, 5, ap.(of.) 1 |
||
Administrator |
1995-05-24 - 2016-10-03
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Sovetscaia, 3 |
||
Administrator |
1995-11-07 - 2016-10-03
UTA Găgăuzia, Ceadîr-Lunga, str. Tolstoi L., 54 |