Brokerage for the sale of a wide range of goods
Possible affiliates
Denumire | Administratori | Statut/ Adresa | |
---|---|---|---|
Administrator |
1994-09-14 - 2017-04-10
Căuşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 3, ap.(of.) 92 |
||
Administrator |
1994-04-11 - 2017-03-24
Căuşeni, str. Meşterul Stanciu, 1, ap.(of.) 3 |
||
Administrator |
1994-01-26 - 2017-03-16
Căuşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 33 |
||
Administrator |
1993-03-18 - 2017-04-04
Căuşeni, Hagimus, str. Dacia, 28 |
||
Administrator |
1993-01-27 - 2017-04-04
Căuşeni, str. Eminescu Mihai, 8, ap.(of.) 89 |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-14 - 2017-03-20
Căuşeni, Cîrnăţeni |
||
Administrator |
1996-12-18 - 2017-03-15
Căuşeni, str. Unirii, 8, ap.(of.) 39 |
||
Administrator |
1993-08-10 - 2017-03-24
Ştefan Vodă, str. Livezilor, 47 |
||
Administrator |
1994-10-19 - 2017-04-11
Ştefan Vodă, str. Libertăţii, 4, ap.(of.) 14 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-03 - 2017-04-03
Ştefan Vodă, str. Bugeacului, 14, ap.(of.) 2 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-06 - 2017-04-11
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August, 16/1, ap.(of.) 40 |
||
Administrator |
1997-02-21 - 2017-04-06
Ştefan Vodă, str. 31 August, 7/2, ap.(of.) 62 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-26 - 2017-03-22
Căuşeni, Baimaclia |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-27 - 2017-03-14
Căuşeni, Căinari, str. Negraia, 11 |
||
Administrator |
1995-08-15 - 2017-03-22
Căuşeni, Taraclia |
||
Administrator |
1994-08-22 - 2017-03-14
Căuşeni, str. Costin Miron, 62 |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-08 - 2017-04-03
Căuşeni, Hagimus |
||
Administrator |
1993-02-11 - 2017-03-22
Căuşeni, Sălcuţa |
||
Administrator |
1993-12-21 - 2017-04-04
Căuşeni, Grigorievca, str. Biruinţa |
||
Administrator |
1994-12-23 - 2017-03-13
Căuşeni, str. Ştefan cel Mare, 84, ap.(of.) 12 |
||
Administrator |
1995-04-05 - 2017-04-12
Căuşeni, Ursoaia, str. 31 August, 19 |
||
Administrator |
1995-07-24 - 2017-04-04
Căuşeni, Fîrlădeni |
||
Administrator |
2000-05-26 - 2017-04-12
Căuşeni, str. Mateevici A., 9 |
||
Administrator |
1992-10-13 - 2017-04-04
Căuşeni, Zaim |
||
Administrator |
1996-02-27 - 2017-04-04
Căuşeni, str. Cantemir Dmitrie, 34, ap.(of.) 20 |
||
Administrator |
1996-01-25 - 2017-03-20
Căuşeni, str. Colina Verde, 2, ap.(of.) 7 |
||
Administrator |
1995-01-11 - 2017-04-04
Căuşeni, Sălcuţa |
||
Administrator |
1996-05-16 - 2017-03-24
Căuşeni, Fîrlădeni |
||
Administrator |
1997-04-18 - 2016-03-11
Ungheni, str. Micle Veronica, 2, ap.(of.) 13 |
||
Administrator |
1998-05-13 - 2016-04-08
Ungheni, str. Alecsandri Vasile, 24 |
||
Administrator |
1996-07-18 - 2016-04-14
Ungheni, str. Decebal, 14, ap.(of.) 53 |
||
Administrator |
1995-02-21 - 2016-04-12
Nisporeni, Iurceni |
||
Administrator |
1992-09-21 - 2016-05-18
Ungheni, str. Boico Alexandru, 5, ap.(of.) 47 |
||
Administrator |
1993-04-22 - 2016-05-16
Ungheni, Corneşti |
||
Administrator |
2000-07-17 - 2016-08-11
Ungheni, Costuleni |